Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472774

EP3472774 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR RECOMMENDING TO A FIRST USER MEDIA ASSETS FOR INCLUSION IN A PLAYLIST FOR A SECOND USER BASED ON THE SECOND USER'S VIEWING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2160 Gold Street
San Jose, CA 95002 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHUNG, David, D.
2554 Corte Del Marques
Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Pisani, Diana Jean , et al
Haley Guiliano International LLP
Central Court
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17730309.601.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US35367
Priority number, dateUS20161518856221.06.2016         Original published format: US201615188562
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222771
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472774
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10, G06Q50/00, G06Q30/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR EMPFEHLUNG VON MEDIENBESTÄNDEN FÜR EINEN ERSTEN BENUTZER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER ABSPIELLISTE FÜR EINEN ZWEITEN BENUTZER AUSGEHEND VON DER BETRACHTUNGSAKTIVITÄT DES ZWEITEN BENUTZERS[2019/17]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR RECOMMENDING TO A FIRST USER MEDIA ASSETS FOR INCLUSION IN A PLAYLIST FOR A SECOND USER BASED ON THE SECOND USER'S VIEWING ACTIVITY[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR RECOMMANDER À UN PREMIER UTILISATEUR DES CONTENUS MULTIMÉDIAS À INCLURE DANS UNE LISTE DE DIFFUSION POUR UN DEUXIÈME UTILISATEUR SUR LA BASE DE L'ACTIVITÉ DE VISUALISATION DU DEUXIÈME UTILISATEUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
30.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2015382052  (PEARLMAN CRAIG [US], et al) [I] 1-50 * paragraphs [0030] - [0049]; figures 1-4 *;
 [I]US2015249864  (TANG YOUNG A [US], et al) [I] 1-50 * paragraphs [0040] - [0052]; figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0104] - [0120]; figures 7-10 *;
 [I]US2016088352  (AGARWAL AKSHAT [IN], et al) [I] 1-50 * paragraphs [0024] - [0041]; figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0131] - [0146]; figure 7 *;
 [I]US2014082659  (FIFE BRIAN [US], et al) [I] 1-50 * paragraphs [0039] - [0040]; figures 3-4 *
by applicantUS6564378
 US6239794
 US2003110499
 US6756997
 US6388714
 US2005251827
 US7165098
 US2002174430
 US2010153885
 US7761892
 US8046801