Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465159

EP3465159 - INTEGRATED DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND ANALYZING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Quantum-si Incorporated
530 Old Whitfield Street
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ROTHBERG, Jonathan, M.
215 Uncas Point Road
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
02 / KABIRI, Ali
58 Green Hill Road
Madison, CT 06443 / US
03 / SCHMID, Gerard
140 Wildrose Avenue
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
04 / FIFE, Keith, G.
635 Matadero Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
05 / BEACH, James
1501 Resaca Boulevard
Austin, TX 78738 / US
06 / SICKLER, Jason, W.
10 High Field Lane
Madison, CT 06443 / US
07 / WEST, Lawrence, C.
774 Blairwood Court
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
08 / GLENN, Paul, E.
22 Pinewood Road
Wellesley, MA 02482 / US
09 / PRESTON, Kyle
461 Maupas Road
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
10 / GHASEMI, Farshid
373 New Whitfield Street
Apt. B
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
11 / CIPRIANY, Benjamin
176 Turtle Bay Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
12 / LACKEY, Jeremy
636 Nortontown Road
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730311.201.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35412
Priority number, dateUS201662344123P01.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662344123 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018013243
Date:18.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465159
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, C12Q1/68
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION UND ANALYSE VON MOLEKÜLEN[2019/15]
English:INTEGRATED DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND ANALYZING MOLECULES[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION ET L'ANALYSE DE MOLÉCULES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2016084761  (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16,17 * paragraph [0314]; figures 5-6B * * paragraph [0383]; figures 6-11B * * paragraphs [0252] , [0267] , [0268] , [0283] , [0288] , [0298] , [0609] *