Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469513


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
25.06.2019 Amendment by applicant
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
20.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.2018 Change - representative
23.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication