blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3469513 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780036009 EP17730315



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109313694Global Dossier 05.02.2019A
Priority number Date
US201615178966 10.06.2016
WO2017US35565 02.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3469513Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615178966 10.06.2016
WO2017US35565 02.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017213965Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615178966 10.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10209726Global Dossier 19.02.2019B2
US2017357279 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615178966 10.06.2016