Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469513

EP3469513 - SECURE INPUT VOLTAGE ADJUSTMENT IN PROCESSING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HOVIS, William Paul
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / BLANKENBURG, Garrett Douglas
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / ATKINSON, Peter Anthony
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / RAY, Robert James
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / HERNANDEZ MOJICA, Andres Felipe
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / BOSHRA-RIAD, Samy
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
07 / WEE, Erng-Sing
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
08 / LANGENDORF, Brian Keith
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730315.302.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US35565
Priority number, dateUS20161517896610.06.2016         Original published format: US201615178966
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213965
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469513
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/81
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SICHERE EINGANGSSPANNUNGSREGELUNG BEI VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN[2019/16]
English:SECURE INPUT VOLTAGE ADJUSTMENT IN PROCESSING DEVICES[2019/16]
French:AJUSTEMENT DE TENSION D'ENTRÉE SÉCURISÉ DANS DES DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2006069903  (FISCHER STEPHEN A [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] * * paragraph [0021] *;
 [A]US2014176581  (SHRALL JEREMY J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] *;
 [A]EP2889720  (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] *