Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469561

EP3469561 - APPARATUS FOR PRECESSING DOCUMENTS OF VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GNANANESAN, Bentin
Gnana Bhavan Ambanad Kaimanam PO
Thiruvananthapuram
695040 Kerala / IN
02 / SINGH, Lalit Pal
H-107 Sector-Beta 2
Greater Noida District:
G.B. Nagar 201308 Uttar Pradesh / IN
03 / SUBRAMANI, Poobalan
Plot no:5 F5 Mullai Street
SriSakthi Nagar
Mullal Street
Chennai-600109 / IN
 [2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730374.012.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP00686
Priority number, dateIN335CH201614.06.2016         Original published format: IN 335CH2016
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215783
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469561
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G07D11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON WERTDOKUMENTEN[2019/16]
English:APPARATUS FOR PRECESSING DOCUMENTS OF VALUE[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS DE VALEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6880692  (MAZUR RICHARD A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-14,16-21 * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 2 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 14 * * figures 1,10,12 * [I] 4,11,15,22,23;
 [A]EP1864925  (RUE DE INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0080] - [0084] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0073] * * paragraph [0150] * * figures 1,3-13,37-39 *;
 [XI]DE19958017  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-10,13,16-22 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 4-6,11,12,14,15,23;
 [XI]EP2991047  (GLORY KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-10,16,17,20,21,23 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0082] * * figures 1,3A,6-8 * [I] 4-6,11-15,18,19,22