Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471992

EP3471992 - DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING A CHARGING CABLE ON A CHARGING STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innogy SE
Opernplatz 1
45128 Essen / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HELNERUS, Stefan
Sunderner Straße 31
59821 Arnsberg / DE
02 / WAFFNER, Jürgen
Ernststraße 1
45307 Essen / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17730377.325.04.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP59695
Priority number, dateDE20161011109417.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016111094
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215821
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471992
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60L53/14, B60L53/16, B60L53/31, B60L53/18, B60L53/10
[2019/35]
Former International [2019/17]B60L11/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES LADEKABELS AN EINER LADESTATION[2019/17]
English:DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING A CHARGING CABLE ON A CHARGING STATION[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER UN CÂBLE DE CHARGE À UNE STATION DE CHARGE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2018National basic fee paid 
06.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
06.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]JP2013051827  (PFU LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1a, 2 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3a, 3b, 3c, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0083]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0096]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0102] * [A] 11,13,15 [Y] 14 [I] 12;
 [A]JP2010264871  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 2,11,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0068]; figures 8, 9 *;
 [A]DE102009016895  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 2,11,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] *;
 [YA]US2014067680  (TURNER DEXTER [US]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0056]; figures 6, 7 * [A] 15