Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469076

EP3469076 - MUTANT LIPASE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DE JONG, René Marcel
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
02 / BIJLEVELD, Willem
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
03 / VAN RIJ, Evert Tjeerd
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730432.608.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63919
Priority number, dateEP2016017395510.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173955
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211930
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469076
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/20, C12N15/55
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:MUTANTE LIPASE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:MUTANT LIPASE AND USE THEREOF[2019/16]
French:LIPASE MUTANTE ET UTILISATION DE CETTE DERNIÈRE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1130100  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,6-8,13,14,17 * the whole document * [Y] 15,16;
 [YDA]WO2015087833  (AMANO ENZYME INC [JP]) [YD] 15,16 * the whole document * [A] 1-14,17
 [IDY]  - JUTTA SCHMITT ET AL, "Blocking the tunnel: engineering of Candida rugosa lipase mutants with short chain length specificity", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20020701), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:10.1093/PROTEIN/15.7.595, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 595 - 601, XP008142588 [ID] 2-5,9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/15.7.595
 [X]  - "RecName: Full=Carboxylic ester hydrolase {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361235}; EC=3.1.1.- {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361235};", UniProt, (20110111), Database accession no. E3RTT7, URL: EBI, XP002763811 [X] 1,6 * sequence . *
 [X]  - "RecName: Full=Carboxylic ester hydrolase {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361235}; EC=3.1.1.- {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361235};", UniProt, (20151014), Database accession no. A0A0J9X5E4, URL: EBI, XP002763812 [X] 1,6 * sequence . *
by applicantWO2015087833
 WO2006077258
 WO2008000632
 WO2010121933
 WO2013007820
 WO2013007821
 WO03010183
 WO03001311
 WO2005059149
 WO0056900
 WO9600787
 WO9303159
 WO9914338
    - AKOH et al., Lipids, (20040000), vol. 39, no. 6, pages 513 - 526
    - SCHMITT, J. et al., Protein Engineering, (20020000), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 595 - 601
    - NEEDLEMAN, S. B.; WUNSCH, C. D., J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - RICE,P.; LONGDEN,L.; BLEASBY,A., "EMBOSS: The European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", Trends in Genetics, vol. 16, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2, (20000000), pages 276 - 277, URL: http://emboss.bioinformatics.nl, XP004200114

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10
    - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 3389 - 3402
    - CREGG JM; BARRINGER KJ; HESSLER AY; MADDEN KR, "Pichia pastoris as a host system for transformations", Mol.Cell. Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 3376 - 3385
    - SOM,T.; ARMSTRONG,K.A.; VOLKERT,F.C.; BROACH,J.R., Cell, (19880000), vol. 52, pages 27 - 37
    - BROACH, J.R., "The yeast plasmid 2 µm circle", BROACH, J.R., Strathern, J.N., Jones, E.W., and Broach, J.R., The molecular biology of the yeast Saccharomyces: Life cycle and inheritance, Cold Spring Harbor, (19810000), pages 455 - 470
    - BROCCA S.; SCHMIDT-DANNERT C.; LOTTI M.; ALBERGHINA L.; SCHMID R.D., Protein Sci., (19980000), pages 1415 - 1422
    - LIN-CEREGHINO J1; WONG WW; XIONG S; GIANG W; LUONG LT; VU J; JOHNSON SD; LIN-CEREGHINO GP, Biotechniques, (20050000), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 44 - 48