Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465816

EP3465816 - OPTIMISED RF INPUT SECTION FOR COPLANAR TRANSMISSION LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lumentum Technology UK Limited
Caswell
Towcester, Northamptonshire NN12 8EQ / GB
[2019/34]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Oclaro Technology Limited
Caswell
Towcester, Northamptonshire NN12 8EQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DELL'ORTO, Flavio
Via Enstein 27
20832 Desio (MB) / IT
02 / BALSAMO, Stefano
Viale dell'Aviazione 3/104
20138 Milano (MI) / IT
03 / BONAZZOLI, Mario
Via Damiano Chiesa 6
26100 Cremona (CR) / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730533.106.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51623
Priority number, dateGB2016000981606.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201609816
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212237
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465816
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01P5/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERTER HF-EINGANGSABSCHNITT FÜR KOPLANARE ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNGEN[2019/15]
English:OPTIMISED RF INPUT SECTION FOR COPLANAR TRANSMISSION LINE[2019/15]
French:SECTION D'ENTRÉE RF OPTIMISÉE POUR LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION COPLANAIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US5194833  (DOUGHERTY RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 37; figure 3 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 6,10;
 [Y]US2003228107  (HOWERTON MARTA M [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figure 9 *;
 [A]JP2003163510  (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *