Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464024

EP3464024 - IMPROVEMENTS TO POWER STEERING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Limited
Stratford Road
Solihull, West Midlands B90 4AX / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PRAHLAD, Nikhil
21 Cadet Drive
Shirley
Solihull, West Midlands B90 2FD / GB
02 / CHERANGARA, Sankar
44 Vale Road
Bishops Cleeve Cheltenham GL52 8ER / GB
 [2019/35]
Former [2019/15]01 / PRAHLAD, Nikhil
104 D
Haslucks Green Road
Shirley Solihull B90 2EJ / GB
02 / CHERANGARA, Sankar
44 Vale Road
Bishops Cleeve Cheltenham GL52 8ER / GB
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730540.606.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51639
Priority number, dateGB2016000987206.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201609872
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212251
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464024
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B62D5/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN SERVOLENKSYSTEMEN[2019/15]
English:IMPROVEMENTS TO POWER STEERING SYSTEMS[2019/15]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À DES SYSTÈMES DE DIRECTION ASSISTÉE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015375779  (VARUNJIKAR TEJAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US5596252  (SHIMIZU YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 11, line 62 - column 13, line 31; figures 1-36 *;
 [A]WO2011089430  (TRW LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 11, line 13 - page 17, line 6; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US6131693  (MUKAI YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 1 - column 11, line 40; figures 1-5 *