Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466106

EP3466106 - DETERMINING EARPIECE PRESENCE AT A USER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bugatone Ltd.
5 Druyanov Street
6314305 Tel-Aviv / IL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PETRANK, Noam
8/3 Toscanini Street
6407610 Tel Aviv-Yafo / IL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Conroy, John
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730578.626.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB53123
Priority number, dateUS201662342869P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342869 P
US201662342871P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342871 P
US201662342872P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342872 P
US201662379160P24.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662379160 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203484
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466106
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/10, H04R29/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG DES VORHANDENSEINS EINES OHRHÖRERS IM OHR EINES BENUTZERS[2019/15]
English:DETERMINING EARPIECE PRESENCE AT A USER EAR[2019/15]
French:DÉTERMINATION DE LA PRÉSENCE D'UN ÉCOUTEUR DANS L'OREILLE D'UN UTILISATEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2014270208  (MILLER ANTONIO JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11-15,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,6,10 [I] 16;
 [XYI]WO2008000304  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-15,17,19,20 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 28 * [Y] 4,6,10 [I] 16;
 [XYI]US2011116643  (TISCARENO VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-13,18-20 * paragraphs [0029] , [0049] - [0051] - [0060] - [0065] * [Y] 4,6,10 [I] 16;
 [Y]WO2012167234  (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [Y] 4,6 * page 10, lines 20-27 *;
 [Y]WO2015067981  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 10 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 10 *
by applicantWO2014178054