blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3463457


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.09.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
12.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2018 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
15.12.2018 Change - representative
15.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication