Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463457

EP3463457 - PD-1 BLOCKADE WITH NIVOLUMAB IN REFRACTORY HODGKIN'S LYMPHOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FARSACI, Benedetto
Rt. 206 & Province Line Road
Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730627.101.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35492
Priority number, dateUS201662344880P02.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662344880 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210453
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463457
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61K39/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBA14.12.2018
ME14.12.2018
TitleGerman:PD-1-BLOCKADE MIT NIVOLUMAB BEI REFRAKTÄREM HODGKIN-LYMPHOM[2019/15]
English:PD-1 BLOCKADE WITH NIVOLUMAB IN REFRACTORY HODGKIN'S LYMPHOMA[2019/15]
French:BLOCAGE DE PD-1 AVEC DU NIVOLUMAB DANS LE LYMPHOME DE HODGKIN RÉFRACTAIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
14.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - STEPHEN M. ANSELL ET AL, "PD-1 Blockade with Nivolumab in Relapsed or Refractory Hodgkin's Lymphoma", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE - NEJM -, (20150122), vol. 372, no. 4, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1411087, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 311 - 319, XP055239003 [X] 1-3,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 4-9,12-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1411087
by applicantUS8008449
 WO2013173223
 US6808710
 US7488802
 US8168757
 US8354509
 WO2012145493
 US8900587
 US8609089
 US2013017199
 US2015079109
 WO2015085847
 WO2015112800
 WO2015112900
 WO2014179664
 WO2014194302
 US8779105
 US7943743
 US8217149
 WO2016149201
 US8779108
 US2014356353
 US2014341917
 US6984720
 US7605238
 US5977318
 US6051227
 US6682736
 US7034121
 WO2012122444
 US2012263677
 WO2007113648
    - SJOBLOM et al., Science, (20060000), vol. 366, pages 268 - 274
    - WANG et al., Cancer Immunol Res, (20140000), vol. 2, pages 846 - 856
    - TOPALIAN et al., N Engl J Med, (20120000), vol. 366, pages 2443 - 2454
    - TOPALIAN et al., J Clin Oncol, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 1020 - 1030
    - DRAKE et al., BJUInt, (20130000), vol. 112, pages 1 - 17
    - ANSELL et al., Blood, (20150000), vol. 126, page 583
    - GREEN et al., Blood, (20100000), vol. 116, pages 3268 - 3277
    - JUSZCZYNSKI et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20070000), vol. 104, pages 13134 - 13139
    - KUPPERS, Nat Rev Cancer, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 15 - 27
    - TAUBE et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20140000), vol. 20, pages 5064 - 5074
    - STEIDL et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 377 - 381
    - ANDORSKY et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 4232 - 4244
    - GREEN et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20120000), vol. 18, pages 1611 - 1618
    - ARMAND et al., J Clin Oncology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 4199 - 4206
    - CHEN et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20130000), vol. 19, pages 3462 - 3473
    - KURUVILLA et al., Blood, (20110000), vol. 117, pages 4208 - 4217
    - CHEN et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20130000), vol. 19, no. 13, pages 3462 - 3473
    - CONDEELIS; WEISSLEDER, "In vivo imaging in cancer", Cold Spring Harb. Perspect. Biol., (20100000), vol. 2, no. 12, page a003848
    - MCCABE; WU, "Positive progress in immunoPET—not just a coincidence", Cancer Biother. Radiopharm., (20100000), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1089/cbr.2010.0776, pages 253 - 61, XP009150571

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/cbr.2010.0776
    - OLAFSEN et al., "ImmunoPET imaging of B-cell lymphoma using 124I-anti-CD20 scFv dimers (diabodies", Protein Eng. Des. Sel., (20100000), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 243 - 9
    - TAUBE et al., "Colocalization of inflammatory response with B7-hl expression in human melanocytic lesions supports an adaptive resistance mechanism of immune escape", Sci. Transl. Med., (20120000), vol. 4, no. 127, doi:doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3003689, page 127ra3, XP055370851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3003689
    - WANG et al., "In vitro characterization of the anti-PD-1 antibody nivolumab, BMS-936558, and in vivo toxicology in non-human primates", Cancer Imm Res, (20140000), vol. 2, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-14-0040, pages 846 - 56, XP055206944

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-14-0040
    - HERBST et al., J Clin Oncol, vol. 31, page 3000
    - BRAHMER et al., N EngI J Med, (20120000), vol. 366, pages 2455 - 65
    - TOPALIAN et al., NEngl J Med, (20120000), vol. 366, pages 2443 - 54
    - HERBST et al., J Clin Oncol, (20130000), vol. 31, page 3000
    - HODI et al., N EngI JMed, (20100000), vol. 363, pages 711 - 23
    - WOLCHOK et al., N Engl JMed, (20130000), vol. 369, no. 2, pages 122 - 33
    - BRAHMER et al., J Clin Oncol, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 3167 - 75
    - JOHNSON et al., Cancer Immunol Res, (20130000), vol. 1, pages 373 - 77
    - RINI et al., Cancer, (20110000), vol. 117, pages 758 - 67
    - TOPALIAN et al., N EngI JMed, (20120000), vol. 366, pages 2443 - 54
    - TOPALIAN et al., Curr Opin Immunol, (20120000), vol. 24, pages 207 - 12