Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472323

EP3472323 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS TO CONTROL INSECT PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue
P.O. Box 1014
Johnston, Iowa 50131-1014 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HU, Xu
7250 NW 62nd Avenue
PO Box 552
Johnston Iowa 50131-0552 / US
02 / NIU, Xiping
7250 NW 62nd Avenue
PO Box 552
Johnston Iowa 50131-0552 / US
03 / RICHTMAN, Nina
7250 NW 62nd Avenue
PO Box 552
Johnston Iowa 50131-0552 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17730632.102.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US35585
Priority number, dateUS201662350942P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350942 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218207
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472323
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82, C07K14/435
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON INSEKTENSCHÄDLINGEN[2019/17]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS TO CONTROL INSECT PESTS[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE LUTTE CONTRE DES INSECTES NUISIBLES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2012055982  (DEVGEN NV [BE], et al) [X] 1,31,52 * SEQ ID NO:1 fully comprises present SEQ ID NO:16 and shows 97.5% identity to present SEQ ID NO:15 * * the whole document * [I] 2-30,32-51,53-83;
 [A]WO2016043960  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * example - *;
 [A]WO2016044092  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * example - *;
 [A]WO2014153254  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * example 4 *;
 [A]WO2014159829  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 8 * claim 15 *;
 [A]WO2009091862  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [A] 1-83;
 [A]WO2016060912  (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [A] 1-83;
 [XPI]US2016230186  (BAUM JAMES A [US], et al) [XP] 1,31,52 * the whole document * [I] 2-30,32-51,53-83;
 [A]  - ANALIZA P. ALVES ET AL, "RNA Interference as a Method for Target-Site Screening in the Western Corn Rootworm, Diabrotica Virgifera Virgifera", JOURNAL OF INSECT SCIENCE, Washington, DC, USA, (20100901), vol. 10, no. 162, doi:10.1673/031.010.14122, ISSN 1536-2442, pages 1 - 16, XP055226387 [A] 1-83

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1673/031.010.14122
 [A]  - Y. IZUMI ET AL, "A novel protein complex, Mesh-Ssk, is required for septate junction formation in the Drosophila midgut", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, GB, (20120801), vol. 125, no. 20, doi:10.1242/jcs.112243, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 4923 - 4933, XP055226384 [A] 1-83

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.112243
 [XP]  - XU HU ET AL, "Discovery of midgut genes for the RNA interference control of corn rootworm", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20160728), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep30542, XP055394042 [XP] 1-83 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep30542
by applicantUS2014275208
 US2015257389
 US5283184
 US5034323
 US5942657
 WO0200904
 US2003175965
 US2009155910
 WO2009079532
 US2009155909
 WO2009079548
 US2007130653
 WO9943838
 US6072050
 US5659026
 US5608149
 US5608144
 US5604121
 US5569597
 US5466785
 US5399680
 US5268463
 US5608142
 US6177611
 WO9943819
 US5428148
 US5750386
 US5814618
 US5789156
 US5837876
 US5633363
 US5459252
 US5401836
 US5110732
 US5023179
 US6225529
 WO0012733
 US2003106097
 US6797859
 US2008275115
 US2008242174
 US2008027143
 US2005042245
 US2004127520
 US5039523
 US4853331
 EP0480762
 US5563055
 US5981840
 US4945050
 US5879918
 US5886244
 US5932782
 WO0028058
 US5240855
 US5322783
 US5324646
 US5736369
 US5889191
 US5889190
 US5866785
 US5589367
 US5316931
 WO9925821
 WO9925854
 WO9925840
 WO9925855
 WO9925853
 US5188960
 US5689052
 US5880275
 US5986177
 US6023013
 US6060594
 US6063597
 US6077824
 US6620988
 US6642030
 US6713259
 US6893826
 US7105332
 US7179965
 US7208474
 US7227056
 US7288643
 US7323556
 US7329736
 US7449552
 US7468278
 US7510878
 US7521235
 US7544862
 US7605304
 US7696412
 US7629504
 US7705216
 US7772465
 US7790846
 US7858849
 WO9114778
 WO9931248
 WO0112731
 WO9924581
 WO9740162
 US6048838
 US6379946
 US2014007292
 US2014033361
 US2014274885
 US2016040184
 WO2015023846
 WO2015038734
 WO2015120270
 WO2015120276
 US8304604
 US8304605
 US6033874
 US6218188
 US7070982
 US6962705
 US6713063
 US7064249
 US2010017914
 US7803943
 US7476781
 US7378499
 US7462760
 US6127180
 US6624145
 US6340593
 US6248535
 US6326351
 US6399330
 US6949626
 US7385107
 US7504229
 US2006191034
 US2012278954
 WO2012139004
 US6083499
 US6548291
 US2008295207
 US2006033867
 US2016108428
 US8236757
 US7923602
 WO2006083891
 WO2005038032
 WO2005021585
 US2004250311
 US2004216186
 US2004210965
 US2004210964
 US2004197917
 US2004197916
 WO2006119457
 WO2004074462
 US8084416
 US2011023184
 US2011263488
 US2010197592
 WO2011103248
 US8334431
 US2010298211
 US2009144852
 US8318900
 US2010005543
 US8319019
 US2011064710
 WO2016061197
 US2012317682
 US2012311746
 US2012311745
 US2012317681
 US2012331590
 US2012331589
 US2012324606
 US2012324605
 US2013167269
 US2013167268
 US2013116170
 US7491869
 US5877012
 US6107279
 US6137033
 US7244820
 US7615686
 US8237020
 US7491698
 US8084418
 US8334366
 US5266317
 WO9302197
 US6563020
 US7145060
 US7087810
 WO9516776
 US5580852
 WO9518855
 US5607914
 US6891085
 US7306946
 US2012110696
 US5716820
 US5792931
 US5798255
 US5846812
 US6083736
 US6538177
 US6388171
 US6812380
 US7205453
 WO03000863
 US6911577
 US6855865
 US6777592
 US7238781
 WO9630517
 WO9319181
 WO03033651
 US6284948
 US7301069
 WO2012058266
 US5689035
 US2009035765
 WO2007074405
 WO2005110068
 WO2009091864
 US2012198586
 WO2012055982
 WO2007035650
 US2011054007
 WO2016060911
 WO2016060912
 WO2016060913
 WO2016060914
 US2012029750
 US2012297501
 US2012322660
 US2012164205
 US5605011
 US5013659
 US5141870
 US5767361
 US5731180
 US5304732
 US4761373
 US5331107
 US5928937
 US5378824
 WO9633270
 US4940835
 US5627061
 US6566587
 US6338961
 US6248876
 US6040497
 US5804425
 US5633435
 US5145783
 US4971908
 US5312910
 US5188642
 US5094945
 US5866775
 US6225114
 US6130366
 US5310667
 US4535060
 US4769061
 US5633448
 US5510471
 USRE36449E
 USRE37287E
 US5491288
 EP1173580
 WO0166704
 EP1173581
 EP1173582
 US5776760
 US5463175
 US7462481
 US7405074
 US2008234130
 EP0333033
 US4975374
 EP0242246
 EP0242236
 US5969213
 US5489520
 US5550318
 US5874265
 US5919675
 US5561236
 US5648477
 US5646024
 US6177616
 US5879903
 US4810648
 US6288306
 US6282837
 US5767373
 WO0112825
 WO2005107437
 US2009093366
 US2003135879
 WO9964579
 US6063947
 US6323392
 US6372965
 WO9311245
 WO0112800
 WO0242424
 WO9822604
 WO03011015
 WO02057439
 US6423886
 US6197561
 US6825397
 US2003079247
 US2003204870
 US8058571
 US8338152
 US8063269
 EP2404499
 US2012066794
 US2011191904
 US8217223
 WO2005113778
 WO02059324
 US2003009011
 WO03027243
 WO9905298
 US6291224
 US6391348
 WO9845448
 WO9955882
 WO0104147
 US6531648
 US6858778
 US2005160488
 US2005204418
 WO9910498
 US6232529
 US6787683
 US2004034886
 WO0068393
 WO03082899
 US6127600
 US6080913
 US5990389
 WO9940209
 WO9929882
 US5850016
 WO9820133
 US5885802
 US5885801
 US6664445
 US6459019
 US6441274
 US6346403
 US5939599
 US5912414
 WO9856935
 WO9845458
 WO9842831
 US5633436
 US5559223
 WO9601905
 WO9515392
 US2003163838
 US2003150014
 US2004068767
 US6803498
 WO0179516
 US4654465
 US4727219
 US3861709
 US3710511
 US5432068
 WO0129237
 WO9213956
 WO9213957
 US5859341
 US6297426
 US5478369
 US5824524
 US5850014
 US6265640
 WO0073475
 US5892009
 US5965705
 US5929305
 US5891859
 US6417428
 US6664446
 US6706866
 US6717034
 US6801104
 WO0060089
 WO0126459
 WO0135725
 WO0134726
 WO0135727
 WO0136444
 WO0136597
 WO0136598
 WO0215675
 WO0217430
 WO02077185
 WO02079403
 WO03013227
 WO03013228
 WO03014327
 WO2004031349
 WO2004076638
 WO9809521
 WO9938977
 US2004148654
 WO0136596
 WO0006341
 WO2004090143
 US7531723
 US6992237
 WO0202776
 WO03052063
 JP2002281975
 US6084153
 WO0164898
 US6177275
 US6107547
 US2004128719
 US2003166197
 WO0032761
 US2004098764
 US2004078852
 US8058515
 US2011283420
 US8058510
 US2011277181
 US2010287669
 WO2012058528
 US2012272352
 US8338661
 US2010257633
 US2011061133
 US2010024067
 WO9749811
 WO9856918
 WO9710339
 US6573430
 US6713663
 WO9614414
 WO9638560
 WO0121822
 WO0044918
 WO9949064
 WO0046358
 WO9729123
 US6794560
 US6307126
 WO9909174
 US8097769
 US2012079623
 US2012079622
 WO2012038893
 EP2431472
 US2009064373
 US5366892
 US5747450
 US5737514
 US5723756
 US5593881
 US5981722
 US5703409
 WO9820122
 US5952544
 WO9411516
 US5602321
 US5583210
 US7786353
 WO9961619
 WO0017364
 US4272417
 US4245432
 US4808430
 US5876739
 US2003176428
 WO02080675
 WO0228186
 US2013019349
 WO9832326
    - ARONSON, Cell Mol. Life Sci., (20020000), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 417 - 425
    - SCHNEPF et al., Microbiol. Mol. Biol. Rev., (19980000), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 775 - 806
    - GASSMANN et al., PNAS, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 14, pages 5141 - 5146
    - OLESON et al., J. Econ. Entomol., (20050000), vol. 98, pages 1 - 8
    - LIU et al., Plant Physiol., (20020000), vol. 129, pages 1732 - 1743
    - VERDEL et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 672 - 676
    - PAL-BHADRA et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 669 - 672
    - ALLSHIRE, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 1818 - 1819
    - VOLPE et al., Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 1833 - 1837
    - JENUWEIN, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 2215 - 2218
    - HALL et al., Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 2232 - 2237
    - CHUANG; MEYEROWITZ, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 4985 - 4990
    - STOUTJESDIJK et al., Plant Physiol., (20020000), vol. 129, pages 1723 - 1731
    - WATERHOUSE; HELLIWELL, Nat. Rev. Genet, (20030000), vol. 4, pages 29 - 38
    - PANDOLFINI et al., BMC Biotechnology, vol. 3, page 7
    - PANSTRUGA et al., Mol. Biol. Rep., (20030000), vol. 30, pages 135 - 140
    - VICKERS et al., J. Biol. Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, pages 7108 - 7118
    - YANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 9442 - 9447
    - AUFSATZ et al., PNAS, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 4, pages 16499 - 16506
    - METTE et al., EMBO J, (20000000), vol. 19, no. 19, pages 5194 - 5201
    - MEISTER; TUSCHL, Nature, (20040000), vol. 431, pages 343 - 349
    - BONETTA et al., Nature Methods, (20040000), vol. 1, pages 79 - 86
    - JAVIER et al., Nature, (20030000), vol. 425, pages 257 - 263
    - SCHWAB R. ET AL, Plant Cell, (20060310), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 1121 - 1133
    - NIU QW ET AL, Nat Biotechnol., (20061022), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 1420 - 1428
    - Nat Biotechnol., (20070200), vol. 25, no. 2, page 254
    - SCHWAB R et al., Dev Cell, (20050000), vol. 8, pages 517 - 527
    - MARKHAM, N. R.; ZUKER, M., Nucleic Acids Res., (20050000), vol. 33, pages W577 - W581
    - ELBAHIR et al., Genes and Development, (20010000), vol. 15, pages 188 - 200
    - SCHWARTZ et al., Cell, (20030000), vol. 115, pages 199 - 208
    - KHVOROVA et al., Cell, (20030000), vol. 115, pages 209 - 216
    - GUERINEAU et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 262, pages 141 - 144
    - PROUDFOOT, Cell, (19910000), vol. 64, pages 671 - 674
    - SANFACON et al., Genes Dev., (19910000), vol. 5, pages 141 - 149
    - MOGEN et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 1261 - 1272
    - MUNROE et al., Gene, (19900000), vol. 91, pages 151 - 158
    - BALLAS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19890000), vol. 17, pages 7891 - 7903
    - JOSHI et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19870000), vol. 15, pages 9627 - 9639
    - ODELL et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812
    - MCELROY et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 163 - 171
    - CHRISTENSEN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 12, pages 619 - 632
    - CHRISTENSEN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689
    - LAST et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19910000), vol. 81, pages 581 - 588
    - VELTEN et al., EMBO J., (19840000), vol. 3, pages 2723 - 2730
    - REDOLFI et al., Neth. J. Plant Pathol, (19830000), vol. 89, pages 245 - 254
    - UKNES et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 645 - 656
    - VAN LOON, Plant Mol. Virol, (19850000), vol. 4, pages 111 - 116
    - RYAN, Ann. Rev. Phy opath, (19900000), vol. 28, pages 425 - 449
    - DUAN et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 494 - 498
    - STANFORD et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19890000), vol. 215, pages 200 - 208
    - MCGURL et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 225, pages 1570 - 1573
    - ROHMEIER et al., Plant Mol. Biol, (19930000), vol. 22, pages 783 - 792
    - ECKELKAMP et al., FEBS Letters, (19930000), vol. 323, pages 73 - 76
    - CORDEROK et al., Plant J., (19940000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 141 - 150
    - VAN LOON, Plant Mol. Virol., (19850000), vol. 4, pages 111 - 116
    - MARINEAU et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 9, pages 335 - 342
    - MATTON et al., Molecular Plant-Microbe Interactions, (19890000), vol. 2, pages 325 - 331
    - SOMSISCH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 2427 - 2430
    - SOMSISCH et al., Mol. Gen. Genet, (19880000), vol. 2, pages 93 - 98
    - YANG, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 14972 - 14977
    - CHEN et al., Plant J., (19960000), vol. 10, pages 955 - 966
    - ZHANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 2507 - 2511
    - WARNER et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 191 - 201
    - SIEBERTZ et al., Plant Cell, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 961 - 968
    - CORDERO et al., Physiol. Mol. Plant Path., (19920000), vol. 41, pages 189 - 200
    - SCHENA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 10421 - 10425
    - MCNELLIS et al., Plant J., (19980000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 247 - 257
    - GATZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 227, pages 229 - 237
    - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant J., (19970000), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 255 - 265
    - KAWAMATA et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (19970000), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 792 - 803
    - HANSEN et al., Mol. Gen Genet., (19970000), vol. 254, no. 3, pages 337 - 343
    - RUSSELL et al., Transgenic Res, (19970000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 157 - 168
    - RINEHART et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 3, pages 1331 - 1341
    - VAN CAMP et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 525 - 535
    - CANEVASCINI et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 513 - 524
    - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (19940000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 773 - 778
    - LAM, Results Probl. Cell Differ., (19940000), vol. 20, pages 181 - 196
    - OROZCO et al., Plant Mol Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1129 - 1138
    - MATSUOKA et al., Proc Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 9586 - 9590
    - GUEVARA-GARCIA et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 495 - 505
    - KWON et al., Plant Physiol., (19940000), vol. 105, pages 357 - 367
    - GOTOR et al., Plant J, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 509 - 518
    - OROZCO et al., Plant Mol. Biol, (19930000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1129 - 1138
    - MATSUOKA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 9586 - 9590
    - HIRE et al., Plant Mol. Biol, (19920000), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 207 - 218
    - KELLER; BAUMGARTNER, Plant Cell, (19910000), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1051 - 1061
    - SANGER et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 433 - 443
    - MIAO et al., Plant Cell, (19910000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 11 - 22
    - BOGUSZ et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, no. 7, pages 633 - 641
    - Plant Science (Limerick, vol. 79, no. 1, pages 69 - 76
    - EMBO J., vol. 8, no. 2, pages 343 - 350
    - KUSTER et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19950000), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 759 - 772
    - CAPANA et al., Plant Mol. Biol, (19940000), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 681 - 691
    - SCHUNMANN et al., Plant Functional Biology, (20030000), vol. 30, pages 453 - 460
    - KIYOKAWA et al., Plant Physiology, (19940000), vol. 104, pages 801 - 802
    - PANDOLFINI et al., BioMedCentral (BMC) Biotechnology, vol. 3, (20030000), page 7, URL: www.biomedcentral.com/1472-6750/3/7
    - GRAHAM et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19970000), vol. 33, pages 729 - 735
    - ALMON et al., Plant Physiol., (19970000), vol. 115, pages 1599 - 1607
    - DEHIO et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, pages 1199 - 1210
    - KORBER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 3983 - 3991
    - SHI et al., J. Exp. Bot, (19940000), vol. 45, pages 623 - 631
    - MEDBERRY et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 185 - 192
    - ZHOU et al., Chin. J. Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 14, pages 9 - 16
    - ROHDE et al., Plant Mol. Biol, (19940000), vol. 27, pages 623 - 628
    - HEHN; RHODE, J. Gen. Virol, (19980000), vol. 79, pages 1495 - 1499
    - YIN; BEACHY, Plant J., (19950000), vol. 7, pages 969 - 980
    - YIN et al., Plant J., (19970000), vol. 12, pages 1179 - 1180
    - EDWARDS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 3459 - 3463
    - BREARS et al., Plant J., (19910000), vol. 1, pages 235 - 244
    - HEDLEY et al., J. Exp. Botany, (20000000), vol. 51, pages 817 - 821
    - KERTBUNDIT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 5212 - 5216
    - TORNERO et al., Plant J., (19960000), vol. 9, pages 639 - 648
    - ZHANG et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, pages 1111 - 1117
    - RAMLOCH-LORENZ et al., The Plant J., (19930000), vol. 4, pages 545 - 554
    - YOSHIMOTO et al., Plant Physiol., (20030000), vol. 131, pages 1511 - 1517
    - NOLTE; KOCH, Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 101, pages 899 - 905
    - KUHN et al., Science, (19970000), vol. 275, pages 1298 - 1300
    - FUKUDA A et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (20050000), vol. 46, no. 11, pages 1779 - 1786
    - T. WANG et al., J. Exp. Bot, (19940000), vol. 45, no. 274, pages 623 - 631
    - YANG., N-S. et al., PNAS, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 4144 - 4148
    - GUO, H. et al., Transgenic Research, (20040000), vol. 13, pages 559 - 566
    - TRUERNIT, E. et al., Planta, (19950000), vol. 196, no. 3, pages 564 - 570
    - MIJNSBRUGGE KV. et al., Plant Cell. Physiol., (19960000), vol. 37, no. 8, pages 1108 - 1115
    - BHATTACHARYYA-PAKRASI et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 71 - 79
    - SU et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20040000), vol. 85, pages 610 - 619
    - FETTER et al., Plant Cell, (20040000), vol. 16, pages 215 - 528
    - BOLTE et al., J. Cell Science, (20040000), vol. 117, pages 943 - 954
    - KATO et al., Plant Physiol, (20020000), vol. 129, pages 913 - 942
    - YARRANTON, Curr. Opin. Biotech, (19920000), vol. 3, pages 506 - 511
    - CHRISTOPHERSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 6314 - 6318
    - YAO et al., Cell, (19920000), vol. 71, pages 63 - 72
    - REZNIKOFF, Mol. Microbiol, (19920000), vol. 6, pages 2419 - 2422
    - BARKLEY et al., The Operon, (19800000), pages 177 - 220
    - HU et al., Cell, (19870000), vol. 48, pages 555 - 566
    - BROWN et al., Cell, (19870000), vol. 49, pages 603 - 612
    - FIGGE et al., Cell, (19880000), vol. 52, pages 713 - 722
    - DEUSCHLE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 5400 - 5404
    - FUERST et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 2549 - 2553
    - DEUSCHLE et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 248, pages 480 - 483
    - REINES et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 1917 - 1921
    - LABOW et al., Mol. Cell. Biol, (19900000), vol. 10, pages 3343 - 3356
    - ZAMBRETTI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 3952 - 3956
    - BAIRN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 5072 - 5076
    - WYBORSKI et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4647 - 4653
    - HILLENAND-WISSMAN, Topics Mol. Struc. Biol., (19890000), vol. 10, pages 143 - 162
    - DEGENKOLB et al., Antimicrob. Agents Chemother, (19910000), vol. 35, pages 1591 - 1595
    - KLEINSCHNIDT et al., Biochemistry, (19880000), vol. 27, pages 1094 - 1104
    - GOSSEN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 5547 - 5551
    - OLIVA et al., Antimicrob. Agents Chemother, (19920000), vol. 36, pages 913 - 919
    - HLAVKA et al., Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, Springer-Verlag, (19850000), vol. 78
    - GILL et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 334, pages 721 - 724
    - CROSSWAY et al., Biotechniques, (19860000), vol. 4, pages 320 - 334
    - RIGGS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 5602 - 5606
    - PASZKOWSKI et al., EMBO J., (19840000), vol. 3, pages 2717 - 2722
    - MCCABE et al., Biotechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 923 - 926
    - WEISSINGER et al., Ann. Rev. Genet, (19880000), vol. 22, pages 421 - 477
    - SANFORD et al., Particulate Science and Technology, (19870000), vol. 5, pages 27 - 37
    - CHRISTOU et al., Plant Physiol., (19880000), vol. 87, pages 671 - 674
    - MCCABE et al., BiolTechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 923 - 926
    - FINER; MCMULLEN, In Vitro Cell Dev. Biol., (19910000), vol. 27P, pages 175 - 182
    - SINGH et al., Theor. Appl. Genet, (19980000), vol. 96, pages 319 - 324
    - DATTA et al., Biotechnology, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 736 - 740
    - KLEIN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 4305 - 4309
    - KLEIN et al., Biotechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 559 - 563
    - KLEIN et al., Plant Physiol., (19880000), vol. 91, pages 440 - 444
    - FROMM et al., Biotechnology, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 833 - 839
    - HOOYKAAS-VAN SLOGTEREN et al., Nature (London), (19840000), vol. 311, pages 763 - 764
    - BYTEBIER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 5345 - 5349
    - DE WET et al., The Experimental Manipulation of Ovule Tissues, Longman, (19850000), pages 197 - 209
    - KAEPPLER et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19900000), vol. 9, pages 415 - 418
    - KAEPPLER et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19920000), vol. 84, pages 560 - 566
    - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 1505
    - LI et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 250 - 255
    - CHRISTOU; FORD, Annals of Botany, (19950000), vol. 75, pages 407 - 413
    - OSJODA et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750
    - CROSSWAY et al., Mol Gen. Genet, (19860000), vol. 202, pages 179 - 185
    - NOMURA et al., Plant Sci, (19860000), vol. 44, pages 53 - 58
    - HEPLER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19940000), vol. 91, pages 2176 - 2180
    - HUSH et al., The Journal of Cell Science, (19940000), vol. 107, pages 775 - 784
    - PORTA et al., Molecular Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 5, pages 209 - 221
    - MCCORMICK et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19860000), vol. 5, pages 81 - 84
    - JONES et al., Science, (19940000), vol. 266, page 789
    - MARTIN et al., Science, (19930000), vol. 262, page 1432
    - MINDRINOS et al., Cell, (19940000), vol. 78, page 1089
    - MCDOWELL; WOFFENDEN, Trends Biotechnol., (20030000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 178 - 83
    - TOYODA et al., Transgenic Res., (20020000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 567 - 582
    - GEISER et al., Gene, (19860000), vol. 48, page 109
    - MONALYSIN, PLoS Pathogens, (20110000), vol. 7, pages 1 - 13
    - PECHY-TARR, Environmental Microbiology, (20080000), vol. 10, pages 2368 - 2386
    - LIU et al., J. Agric. Food Chem., (20100000), vol. 58, pages 12343 - 12349
    - ZHANG et al., Annals of Microbiology, (20090000), vol. 59, pages 45 - 50
    - LI et al., Plant Cell Tiss. Organ Cult, (20070000), vol. 89, pages 159 - 168
    - HINCHLIFFE et al., The Open Toxinology Journal, (20100000), vol. 3, pages 101 - 118
    - MORGAN et al., Applied and Envir. Micro., (20010000), vol. 67, pages 2062 - 2069
    - NAIMOV et al., Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (20080000), vol. 74, pages 7145 - 7151
    - CRICKMORE et al., Bacillus thuringiensis toxin nomenclature, (20110000), URL: ifesci.sussex.ac.uk/home/Neil_Crickmore/Bt
    - VAN FRANNKENHUYZEN, J. Invert. Path, (20090000), vol. 101, pages 1 - 16
    - SANAHUJA, Plant Biotech Journal, (20110000), vol. 9, pages 283 - 300
    - PURCELL et al., Biochem Biophys Res, (19930000), vol. 15, pages 1406 - 1413
    - HAMMOCK et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 344, page 458
    - REGAN, J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, page 9
    - PRATT et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19890000), vol. 163, page 1243
    - CHATTOPADHYAY et al., Critical Reviews in Microbiology, (20040000), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 33 - 54
    - ZJAWIONY, J Nat Prod, (20040000), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 300 - 310
    - CARLINI; GROSSI-DE-SA, Toxicon, (20020000), vol. 40, no. 11, pages 1515 - 1539
    - USSUF et al., Curr Sci, (20010000), vol. 80, no. 7, pages 847 - 853
    - VASCONCELOS; OLIVEIRA, Toxicon, (20040000), vol. 44, no. 4, pages 385 - 403
    - KRAMER et al., Insect Biochem. Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, page 691
    - KAWALLECK et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 21, page 673
    - BOTELLA et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, page 757
    - GRIESS et al., Plant Physiol., (19940000), vol. 104, page 1467
    - JAYNES et al., Plant Sci., (19930000), vol. 89, page 43
    - BEACHY et al., Ann. Rev. Phytopathol, (19900000), vol. 28, page 451
    - TAVLADORAKI et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 366, page 469
    - LAMB et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 1436
    - TOUBART et al., Plant J., (19920000), vol. 2, page 367
    - LOGEMANN et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 305
    - BRIGGS, Current Biology, (19950000), vol. 5, no. 2
    - PIETERSE; VAN LOON, Curr. Opin. Plant Bio, (20040000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 456 - 464
    - SOMSSICH, Cell, (20030000), vol. 113, no. 7, pages 815 - 816
    - CORNELISSEN; MELCHERS, Pl. Physiol, (19930000), vol. 101, pages 709 - 712
    - PARIJS et al., Planta, (19910000), vol. 183, pages 258 - 264
    - BUSHNELL et al., Can. J. of Plant Path., (19980000), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 137 - 149
    - URWIN et al., Planta, (19980000), vol. 204, pages 472 - 479
    - WILLIAMSON, Curr Opin Plant Bio., (19990000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 327 - 331
    - LEE et al., EMBO J., (19880000), vol. 7, page 1241
    - MIKI et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19900000), vol. 80, page 449
    - DE GREEF et al., Bio/Technology, (19890000), vol. 7, page 61
    - MARSHALL et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19920000), vol. 83, page 435
    - PRZIBILLA et al., Plant Cell, (19910000), vol. 3, page 169
    - HAYES et al., Biochem. J., (19920000), vol. 285, page 173
    - HATTORI et al., Mol Gen Genet., (19950000), vol. 246, page 419
    - SHIOTA et al., Plant Physiol, (19940000), vol. 106, page 17
    - AONO et al., Plant Cell Physiol, (19950000), vol. 36, page 1687
    - DATTA et al., Plant Mol Biol, (19920000), vol. 20, page 619
    - MISAWA et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 4, pages 833 - 840
    - MISAWA et al., Plant J., (19940000), vol. 6, pages 481 - 489
    - KNULTZON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 2624
    - RIVERA-MADRID et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19950000), vol. 92, pages 5620 - 5624
    - VAN HARTINGSVELDT et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 127, page 87
    - SHIROZA et al., J. Bacteriol., (19880000), vol. 170, page 810
    - STEINMETZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19850000), vol. 200, page 220
    - PEN et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, page 292
    - ELLIOT et al., Plant Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 21, page 515
    - SOGAARD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19930000), vol. 268, page 22480
    - FISHER et al., Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 102, page 1045
    - PAUL et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 19, pages 611 - 622
    - LYZNIK et al., Plant Cell Rep, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 925 - 932
    - VAN DAMME et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, page 825
    - WILLIAMSON et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19870000), vol. 165, pages 99 - 106
    - PEDERSEN et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19860000), vol. 261, page 6279
    - KIRIHARA et al., Gene, (19880000), vol. 71, page 359
    - MUSUMURA et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 12, page 123
    - SCHUBERT et al., J. Bacteriol., (19880000), vol. 170, pages 5837 - 5847
 WO2015US55502
 WO2010US60818
 US20010950933
 US20170964507
 US20070657710
 US20070748994
 US20070774121
 US20100683737
 US20010053410
 US20170542901