Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472323 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472323



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 289
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 86
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
21.12.2017 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 42
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 100
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
09.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.01.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
09.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
09.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
09.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.02.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.07.2019 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
26.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
01.08.2019 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1