blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3466214 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780034275 EP17730634



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019157027Global Dossier 23.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201916257134 25.01.2019
US201662345485 03.06.2016
US201715612130 02.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10211013Global Dossier 19.02.2019B2
US2017352506 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201662345485 03.06.2016
US201715612130 02.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109219988Global Dossier 15.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201662345485 03.06.2016
WO2017US35638 02.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3026463Global Dossier 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201662345485 03.06.2016
WO2017US35638 02.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3466214Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201662345485 03.06.2016
WO2017US35638 02.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2018014797 20.05.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201662345485 03.06.2016
WO2017US35638 02.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017210532Global Dossier 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662356053 29.06.2016
US201662345485 03.06.2016