Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466214

EP3466214 - RETROFIT REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.
7200 Suter Road
Coopersburg, PA 18036-1299 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DIMBERG, Chris
2913 Northampton Street
Easton, PA 18045 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730634.702.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35638
Priority number, dateUS201662345485P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345485 P
US201662356053P29.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662356053 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210532
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466214
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H05B37/02, H01H3/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:NACHRÜSTBARE FERNSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:RETROFIT REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TÉLÉCOMMANDE MONTÉ EN RATTRAPAGE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
19.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IDA]US2014117871  (SWATSKY MATTHEW J [US], et al) [ID] 1-8,14-21,26 * page 1, paragraphs 3-10; figures 1-8 * * page 2, paragraph 20 - page 8, paragraph 80; claims 1-42 * [A] 9-13,22-25;
 [A]US2015189725  (KARC JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 25 * * page 5, paragraph 43 - page 9, paragraph 68 *;
 [A]US8084700  (MASSARO MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract *
by applicantUS2008111491
 US8330638
 US7573208
 US7940167
 US8009042
 US8199010
 US8451116
 US8410706
 US2013222122
 US5905442
 US2009206983
 US2014117871
 US2015371534