Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468951

EP3468951 - POLYMORPH OF NINTEDANIB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLON S.p.A.
Strada Rivoltana km. 6/7
20090 Rodano (MI) / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NOVO, Barbara
c/o OLON SpA
Strada Rivoltana Km 6/7
20090 RODANO (MI) / IT
02 / BONANOMI, Jacopo
c/o OLON SpA
Strada Rivoltana Km 6/7
20090 RODANO (MI) / IT
03 / DE FIORE, Stella
c/o OLON SpA
Strada Rivoltana Km 6/7
20090 RODANO (MI) / IT
04 / CALOGERO, Francesco
c/o OLON SpA
Strada Rivoltana Km 6/7
20090 RODANO (MI) / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730721.206.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63640
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0421308.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164213
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211777
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468951
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/34
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:POLYMORPH VON NINTEDANIB[2019/16]
English:POLYMORPH OF NINTEDANIB[2019/16]
French:POLYMORPHE DE NINTÉDANIB[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2018National basic fee paid 
21.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
21.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2016178064  (SUVEN LIFE SCIENCES LTD [IN], et al) [XP] 1-4 * example -; claim - *;
 [XDI]WO2004013099  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2 * page 4; example - * [I] 1-6;
 [XI]US2004176392  (ROTH GERALD J [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 1-6
by applicantWO2004013099