Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469370

EP3469370 - BACKGROUND BLOCKERS FOR BINDING ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Radiometer Turku Oy
Biolinja 12
FI-20750 Turku / FI
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKALO, Harri
Punomontie 22
20360 Turku / FI
02 / BLOMBERG, Kaj
Fältskärsgatan 27
20740 Turku / FI
03 / SUND, Henri
Raunintie 5 A 16
20300 Turku / FI
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Sverrisdóttir, Audur
Radiometer Medical ApS
Åkandevej 21
2700 Brønshøj / DK
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730723.806.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63676
Priority number, dateDK2016000033909.06.2016         Original published format: DK 201600339
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211799
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469370
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/58, C09K11/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HINTERGRUNDBLOCKER FÜR BINDUNGSASSAYS[2019/16]
English:BACKGROUND BLOCKERS FOR BINDING ASSAYS[2019/16]
French:AGENTS DE BLOCAGE DE FOND POUR DOSAGES DE LIAISON[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2018National basic fee paid 
06.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
06.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO2013092992  (DHR FINLAND OY [FI]) [YD] 1-30 * example 44 *;
 [Y]  - HAGAN A K ET AL, "Lanthanide-based time-resolved luminescence immunoassays", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110511), vol. 400, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S00216-011-5047-7, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 2847 - 2864, XP019909258 [Y] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-011-5047-7
 [Y]  - VALENZANO KENNETH J ET AL, "Development of a fluorescent ligand-binding assay using the AcroWell filter plate", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREE, SAGE; LIEBERT, US, (20001201), vol. 5, no. 6, doi:10.1177/108705710000500608, ISSN 1087-0571, pages 455 - 461, XP009124474 [Y] 1-30 * page 456 - page 458; tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/108705710000500608
 [X]  - MYYRYLÃ INEN TIINA ET AL, "Simultaneous detection of Human Immunodeficiency Virus 1 and Hepatitis B virus infections using a dual-label time-resolved fluorometric assay", JOURNAL OF NANOBIOTECHNOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL, GB, (20101126), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1477-3155-8-27, ISSN 1477-3155, page 27, XP021088583 [X] 1-5,7-13,15-20 * figures 1-3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1477-3155-8-27
by applicantWO2013026790
 WO2013092992
 WO2013011236
 WO2014147288
 WO2014162105
 WO2016066641
 WO2012161288
 US4670572
 WO0048991
 WO2008063721
 WO2008008797
    - "Photoluminescence immunoassays", HEMMILA I., Immunochemistry 1: a practical approach, IRL Press Oxford, (19970000), pages 193 - 214
    - "Practical Guide to ELISA development.", JIANWEN, HE., The Immunoassay Handbook, Theory and applications of ligand binding, ELISA and related techniques, Elsevier Oxford, (20130000), pages 381 - 394
    - STEINITZ, M., "Quantification of the blocking effect of Tween 20 and bovine serum albumin in ELISA microwells.", Anal. Biochem., (20000000), vol. 282, pages 232 - 238
    - VOGT, R.F.; PHILIPS, D.L. et al., "Quantitative differences among various proteins as blocking agents for ELISA microtiter plates", J. Immunol. Methods, (19870000), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(87)90214-6, pages 43 - 50, XP023987314

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(87)90214-6
    - BAILEY, M.P. et al., Analyst, (19840000), vol. 109, page 1449
    - KANKARE, J. et al., Anal. Chim. Acta, (19920000), vol. 266, page 205
    - SELVIN, P.R. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19940000), vol. 16, page 6029
    - VON LODE, P. et al., Anal.Chem., (20030000), vol. 75, pages 3193 - 3201