EP3468739 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RIFLING BARRELS OF FIREARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEC - Alpen Energy Consulting GmbH Suetschach 40 9181 Feistritz im Rosental / AT | For all designated states Emag Salach GmbH Austraße 24 73084 Salach / DE | [2022/43] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states AEC - Alpen Energy Consulting GmbH Suetschach 40 9181 Feistritz im Rosental / AT | ||
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Ritter & Stark GmbH Bärenindustriepark 1 u. 12 9181 Feistritz im Rosental / AT | ||
For all designated states Emag Salach GmbH Austraße 24 73084 Salach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURLAKOV, Maxim Unterloibl 50/4 9163 Ferlach / AT | 02 /
GÖHRINGER, Robin Hirschbach 13 74417 Gschwend / DE | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Felix Christopher Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14 80335 München / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17730749.3 | 09.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017EP64189 | Priority number, date | WO2016AT00062 | 09.06.2016 Original published format: PCT/AT2016/000062 | [2019/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212051 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468739 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23H9/00, F41A21/18, B23H3/00, B23H9/14 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
F41A21/18 (EP,US);
B23H3/00 (EP,US);
B23H9/005 (EP,US);
B21C37/152 (US);
B23H9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZÜGEN IN LÄUFEN VON FEUERWAFFEN | [2019/16] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RIFLING BARRELS OF FIREARMS | [2019/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES RAYURES DANS LE CANON D'ARMES À FEU | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 04.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Request for further processing for: | 18.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2020 | 30.06.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 09.01.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2022/07] | 01.04.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2022/07] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2848401 (HARTLEY JAMES C) [A] 7,13 * figure - *; | [IAY]US3630878 (HAGGERTY WILLIAM ANDREW) [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13,15,17,19 * column 3, lines 37-41 * * column 2, lines 55-58 * * column 4, lines 52-55 * * column 5, lines 63-67 * * column 5, lines 20-30 * [A] 3 [Y] 10,11; | [YDA]US4690737 (VISHNITSKY ALEXANDER [US]) [YD] 10,11 * column 5, lines 10-13; claim 1 * [A] 1; | [A]US6387242 (WEI BIN [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, lines 17-22 * * column 7, lines 60-67 * * column 8, lines 1-8 *; | [A]WO2015082524 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 8 *; | [A]DE102014209432 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] *; | [A] - RAJURKAR ET AL, "Modelling and Monitoring Interelectrode Gap in Pulse Electrochemical Machining", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, (19950101), vol. 44, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0007-8506(07)62301-4, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 177 - 180, XP022137024 [A] 1 * page 177, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-8506(07)62301-4 |