Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472614

EP3472614 - ASSAY AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CDC ELICITING ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DENGL, Stefan
Schleissheimer Straße 44A
80333 München / DE
02 / OFFNER, Sonja
Waxensteinstraße 27
82377 Penzberg / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date17730758.412.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64272
Priority number, dateEP2016017467516.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174675
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216098
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472614
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ASSAY UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG CDC-ENTLOCKENDER ANTIKÖRPER[2019/17]
English:ASSAY AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CDC ELICITING ANTIBODIES[2019/17]
French:DOSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ANTICORPS INDUISANT LA CDC[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
16.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2016096788  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [XP] 1,6-9,11,12 * figure 3; example 9; claim 1 *;
 [I]US2006035267  (LIVINGSTON PHILIP O [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * par. 0055, 0056, 0063, 0069, Table 3 *;
 [I]AU2011202520  (GENMAB AS) [I] 1-14 * example 6 *;
 [I]  - GUO B ET AL, "Mapping of binding epitopes of a human decay-accelerating factor monoclonal antibody capable of enhancing rituximab-mediated complement-dependent cytotoxicity", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 128, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CLIM.2008.03.507, ISSN 1521-6616, (20080801), pages 155 - 163, (20080523), XP022849914 [I] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clim.2008.03.507
 [A]  - BOHUA LI ET AL, "Construction and Characterization of a Bispecific Anti-CD20 Antibody with Potent Antitumor Activity against B-Cell Lymphoma", vol. 70, no. 15, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-0009, ISSN 0008-5472, (20100801), pages 6293 - 6302, CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/70/15/6293, (20100714), XP002698653 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-0009