Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468347

EP3468347 - SOILLESS CULTURE FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Combagroup
Chemin de Greybin 2
1415 Molondin / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DE COMBAUD, Benoit
Route de Corençon 9
1410 Saint Cierges / CH
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)IP Trust
2, rue de Clichy
75009 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17730776.614.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64631
Priority number, dateFR2016005549614.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655496
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216267
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468347
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01G31/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ERDLOSE KULTURANLAGE[2019/16]
English:SOILLESS CULTURE FACILITY[2019/16]
French:INSTALLATION POUR LA CULTURE HORS SOL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5323567  (NAKAYAMA SHIGEKI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,5,10,12,13,15,17,18,20,21 * abstract * * figures 1-31 * * column 7, line 46 - column 21, line 9 * [A] 4,6-9,11,14,16,19;
 [Y]NL8401638  (WAVIN BV) [Y] 1-3,5,10,12,13,15,17,18,20,21 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 10 *;
 [Y]US2013014435  (HANSEN KAREN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,5,10,12,13,15,17,18,20,21 * abstract * * figures 1-27 * * paragraphs [0048] - [0053] *;
 [A]US4166341  (VESTERGAARD BENT [DK]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP3480279B  (KAWATETSU LIFE KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]NL8503000  (WAVIN BV) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012124907  (DAAS KAMAL [NL] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantFR3024816
 US5323567
 NL8401638
 US2013014435