Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464830

EP3464830 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ANNULAR EQUIPPED CASING FOR A TURBOMACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/15]METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ANNULAR CASING EQUIPPING A TURBOMACHINE
[2020/09]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2020
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safran Aircraft Engines
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FABRE, Hubert Jean Marie
Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
02 / SIX, Pauline Nathalie
Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
03 / TECHER, Marc-Emmanuel Jean François
Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI)
Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3 Cours du Triangle
CS 80165
92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date17730853.318.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51197
Priority number, dateFR2016005460624.05.2016         Original published format: FR 1654606
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203134
Date:30.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464830
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F01D11/12, F01D25/24, F04D29/52, F04D29/02, F04D29/64
[2020/07]
Former International [2019/15]F01D11/12, F01D25/24, F04D29/52
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RINGFÖRMIGEN AUSGESTATTETEN GEHÄUSES FÜR EINE TURBOMASCHINE[2020/09]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ANNULAR EQUIPPED CASING FOR A TURBOMACHINE[2020/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CARTER ANNULAIRE ÉQUIPÉ DE TURBOMACHINE[2020/09]
Former [2019/15]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RINGFÖRMIGEN GEHÄUSES FÜR EINE TURBOMASCHINE
Former [2019/15]METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ANNULAR CASING EQUIPPING A TURBOMACHINE
Former [2019/15]PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CARTER ANNULAIRE ÉQUIPE DE TURBOMACHINE
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
21.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2886804  (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, paragraph 43 - column 9, paragraph 57; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP2418387  (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, paragraph 43 - column 7, paragraph 56; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]FR2339741  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 4 - page 6, line 22; figures 7,8 *
by applicantEP2886804