Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463586

EP3463586 - PERFUMES IN THE FORM OF AQUEOUS MICROEMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chanel Parfums Beauté
135 avenue Charles de Gaulle
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
For all designated states
Université de Lille
42, rue Paul Duez
59800 Lille / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUCENNA VERDIER, Oriana
18 allée Jean Baptiste Clément
93320 Les Pavillons Sous Bois / FR
02 / MAHE, Christian
73 rue Perronet
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
03 / RATAJ-NARDELLO, Véronique
5 rue Périllat
59710 Pont A Marcq / FR
04 / AUBRY, Jean-Marie
13 rue Casimir Beugnet
62590 Oignies / FR
05 / NOLLET, Maxime
65 cours Gambetta
69003 Lyon / FR
06 / LEBEUF, Raphaël
38 Rue des Meuniers
59000 Lille / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17730886.301.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51374
Priority number, dateFR2016005498301.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1654983
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207936
Date:07.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463586
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61Q13/00, A61K8/06, A61K8/34, A61K8/49
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DUFTSTOFFE IN FORM VON WÄSSRIGEN MIKROEMULSIONEN[2019/15]
English:PERFUMES IN THE FORM OF AQUEOUS MICROEMULSIONS[2019/15]
French:PARFUMS SOUS FORME DE MICROÉMULSIONS AQUEUSES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]FR2998476  (UNIV LILLE 1 SCIENCES & TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [I] 1-8 * page 1, line 4 - line 5 * * page 1, line 18 - line 31 * * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 20 * * page 14, line 8 - line 19 *;
 [A]  - ZHU Y ET AL, "Amphiphilic properties of hydrotropes derived from isosobide : endo/exo isomeric effets and temperature dependence", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 25, no. 23, doi:10.1021/LA902065Q, ISSN 0743-7463, (20091201), pages 13419 - 13425, (20090909), XP002712938 [A] 1-8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la902065q
 [A]  - MORGAN DURAND ET AL, "Solubilizing and Hydrotropic Properties of Isosorbide Monoalkyl- and Dimethyl-Ethers", JOURNAL OF SURFACTANTS AND DETERGENTS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11743-009-1128-4, ISSN 1097-3958, (20091001), pages 371 - 378, (20090519), XP001551488 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11743-009-1128-4
by applicantEP0003088