Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465886

EP3465886 - ELECTRIC MOTOR COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tesla, Inc.
3500 Deer Creek Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAVES, Scott Michael
11100 Sequoia Avenue
Felton, California 95018 / US
02 / DELLAL, Benjamin
3618 16th Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
03 / YANG, Bozhi
290 La Herran Drive
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
04 / MARTINS, Tomas Vianna
88 Townsend Street
Apt 325
San Francisco, California 94107 / US
05 / SWINT, Ethan
321 Jackson Street
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
06 / FEDOSEYEV, Lev
327 Vineyard Drive
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
07 / BELLEMARE, Eric
Unit 6
1993 Plymouth Street
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
08 / OLSEN, Leif E.
850 Roble Avenue
Apt. J
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
09 / HAIN, Alexander
Gebeschusstraße 3
Frankfurt Höchst 65929 / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Eva
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17731032.307.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36285
Priority number, dateUS201662346741P07.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346741 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214232
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465886
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02K9/197, H02K1/32, H02K9/193
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:KÜHLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTROMOTOR[2019/15]
English:ELECTRIC MOTOR COOLING SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2010172132  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-18 * abstract * [Y] 19,20;
 [XY]JP4447410B  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-11,13-16 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 17-20;
 [XY]US2011309698  (KIRKLEY JR THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14,15,17,18 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0129]; figures 12-14 * [Y] 19,20;
 [X]WO2013136405  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,12-16 * abstract *;
 [X]US2012104884  (WAGNER JON [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-12,14,15,17,18 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; figure 5 *;
 [X]DE102013020332  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,9-11,14,15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0072]; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US2012153718  (RAWLINSON PETER DORE [US], et al) [Y] 17-20 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2010320850  (LEMMERS JR GLENN C [US], et al) [A] 1-20
by applicantUS6191511
 US6329731
 US7156195