Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464314

EP3464314 - 15B-SUBSTITUTED ESTRONE DERIVATIVES AS SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF 17B-HYDROXYSTEOID-DEHYDROGENASES, METHOD OF PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ustav Organicke Chemie a Biochemie AV CR, v.v.i.
Flemingovo Namesti 542/2
166 10 Praha / CZ
For all designated states
Ustav Molekularni Genetiky Akademie Ved CR, V.V.I.
Videnska 1083
142 20 Praha / CZ
For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého V Olomouci
Krizkovského 511/8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Helmholtz Zentrum München
Deutsches Forschungszentrum fuer
Gesundheit und Umwelt (GmbH)
Ingoldstaedter Landstrasse 1
85764 Neuherberg / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KOTORA, Martin
Vesinska 6a/1525
15300 Praha 5 Radotin / CZ
02 / PRCHALOVA, Eva
Varnsdorfska 342/4
19000 Praha 9 / CZ
03 / ADAMSKI, Jerzy
Strassbergerstr. 10
80809 München / DE
04 / MÖLLER, Gabriele
Darmstädter Str. 3
80992 München / DE
05 / STEPANEK, Ondrej
Cihlarska 670
46006 Liberec / CZ
06 / BARTUNEK, Petr
Dusni 1
11000 Praha 1 / CZ
07 / SEDLAK, David
Bubenska 17
17000 Praha 7 / CZ
08 / HAJDUCH, Marian
Norbercany - Trhavice 5
79305 Moravsky Beroun / CZ
09 / DZUBAK, Petr
Citov 55
75103 Brodek u Prerova / CZ
 [2019/33]
Former [2019/21]01 / KOTORA, Martin
Vesinska 6a/1525
15300 Praha 5 Radotin / CZ
02 / PRCHALOVA, Eva
Varnsdorfska 342/4
19000 Praha 9 / CZ
03 / ADAMSKI, Jerzy
Strassbergerstr. 10
80809 München / DE
04 / MÖLLER, Gabriele
Darmstädter Str. 3
25263 München / DE
05 / STEPANEK, Ondrej
Cihlarska 670
46006 Liberec / CZ
06 / BARTUNEK, Petr
Dusni 1
11000 Praha 1 / CZ
07 / SEDLAK, David
Bubenska 17
17000 Praha 7 / CZ
08 / HAJDUCH, Marian
Norbercany - Trhavice 5
79305 Moravsky Beroun / CZ
09 / DZUBAK, Petr
Citov 55
75103 Brodek u Prerova / CZ
Former [2019/17]01 / KOTORA, Martin
Vesinska 6a/1525
15300 Praha 5 Radotin / CZ
02 / PRCHALOVA, Eva
Varnsdorfska 342/4
19000 Praha 9 / CZ
03 / ADAMSKI, Jerzy
Strassbergerstr. 10
80809 München / DE
04 / MÖLLER, Gabriele
Damstädter Str. 3
25263 München / DE
05 / STEPANEK, Ondrej
Cihlarska 670
46006 Liberec / CZ
06 / BARTUNEK, Petr
Dusni 1
11000 Praha 1 / CZ
07 / SEDLAK, David
Bubenska 17
17000 Praha 7 / CZ
08 / HAJDUCH, Marian
Norbercany - Trhavice 5
79305 Moravsky Beroun / CZ
09 / DZUBAK, Petr
Citov 55
75103 Brodek u Prerova / CZ
Former [2019/15]01 / KOTORA, Martin
Vesinska 6a/1525
15300 Praha 5 Radotin / CZ
02 / PRCHALOVA, Eva
Varnsdorfska 342/4
19000 Praha 9 / CZ
03 / ADAMSKI, Jerzy
Strassbergerstr. 10
80809 München / DE
04 / MOLLER, Gabriele
Damstadter Str. 3
25263 Munchen / DE
05 / STEPANEK, Ondrej
Cihlarska 670
46006 Liberec / CZ
06 / BARTUNEK, Petr
Dusni 1
11000 Praha 1 / CZ
07 / SEDLAK, David
Bubenska 17
17000 Praha 7 / CZ
08 / HAJDUCH, Marian
Norbercany - Trhavice 5
79305 Moravsky Beroun / CZ
09 / DZUBAK, Petr
Citov 55
75103 Brodek u Prerova / CZ
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
HARBER IP s.r.o.
Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17731057.007.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CZ50022
Priority number, dateCZ2016000034207.06.2016         Original published format: CZ 20160342
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211330
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464314
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07J1/00, A61K31/566, A61P5/32
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:15B-SUBSTITUIERTE ESTRONDERIVATE ALS SELEKTIVE INHIBITOREN VON 17B-HYDROXYSTEROID-DEHYDROGENASEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:15B-SUBSTITUTED ESTRONE DERIVATIVES AS SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF 17B-HYDROXYSTEOID-DEHYDROGENASES, METHOD OF PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF[2019/15]
French:DÉRIVÉS D'OESTRONE SUBSTITUÉS EN 15B EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS SÉLECTIFS DE 17B-HYDROXYSTÉROÏDES DÉSHYDROGÉNASES, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2018National basic fee paid 
16.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
16.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2008034796  (SOLVAY PHARM GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 97; compound 12 * * page 103; table 5; compound 12 * * page 104, paragraph l - page 105, paragraph 1 *
by applicantWO2008034796
 WO2004085457
 WO2012129673
 WO2005047303
 US2005192263
 WO2006125800
 US2006281710
 WO2008065100
 US2008146531
 WO2014207311
 WO2014207309
 WO2014207310
 WO2006003012
 US7419972
 WO2006003013
 WO9946279
 WO2013045407
 WO2014128108
 WO2014009274
    - POIRIER, D., Current. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 10, page 453
    - RYAN, K.J.; ENGEL, L.L., Endocrinology, (19530000), vol. 52, page 287
    - CIOCCA, D.R.; FANELLI, M.A., Trends Endocrinol Metab., (19970000), vol. 8, page 313
    - HONG, Y.; CHEN, S., Mol. Cell. Endocrinol., (20110000), vol. 340, page 120
    - DUFORT et al., Endocrinology, (19990000), vol. 140, page 568
    - QUALTROUGH, D., Int. J. Cancer, (20070000), vol. 121, page 734
    - DEMISSIE et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20010000), vol. 19, page 322
    - EASTELL et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20080000), vol. 26, page 1051
    - POIRIER, D., Expert Opin. Ther. Patents, (20100000), vol. 20, page 1123
    - PENNING, T.M.; RICIGLIANO, J.W., J. Enzyme. Inhib., (19910000), vol. 5, page 165
    - POIRIER, D., Curr. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 10, page 453
    - BROZIC et al., Curr. Med. Chem., (20080000), vol. 15, page 137
    - POIRIER, D., Anti-cancer Agents Med. Chem., (20090000), vol. 9, page 642
    - DAY et al., Minerva Endocrinol., (20100000), vol. 35, page 87
    - CHETRITE et al., J. Steroid Biochem. Molec. Biol., (19960000), vol. 58, page 525
    - CHETRITE, G.S.; PASQUALINI, J.R., J. Steroid Biochem. Molec.Biol., (20010000), vol. 76, page 95
    - SHIELDS-BOTELLA et al., J. Steroid Biochem. Mol. Biol., (20050000), vol. 93, page 1
    - CHETRITE, G.S. et al., Anticancer Res., (20040000), vol. 24, page 1433
    - DELUCA et al., Mol. Cell. Endocrinol., (20060000), vol. 248, page 218
    - POIRIER et al., J. Steroid Biochem. Mol. Biol., (19980000), vol. 64, page 83
    - PELLETIER et al., Steroids, (19940000), vol. 59, page 536
    - TREMBLAY, M.R.; POIRIER, D. J., Chem. Soc., Perkin Trans. 1, (19960000), page 2765
    - QIU et al., FASEB J., (20020000), vol. 16, page 1829
    - POIRIER et al., Synt. Commun., (20030000), vol. 33, page 3183
    - LAWRENCE et al., J. Med. Chem., (20050000), vol. 48, page 2759
    - TREMBLAY, M.R.; POIRIER, D. J., Steroid Biochem. Mol. Biol., (19980000), vol. 66, page 179
    - BLOMQUIST et al., Endocrinol., (19970000), vol. 153, page 453
    - TREMBLAY et al., Steroids, (20010000), vol. 66, page 821
    - CIOBANU, L.C.; POIRIER, D., Chem. Med. Chem., (20060000), vol. 1, page 1249
    - SWEET et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19910000), vol. 180, page 1057
    - ALLAN et al., J. Med. Chem., (20060000), vol. 49, page 1325
    - VICKER et al., Chem. Med. Chem., (20060000), vol. 1, page 464
    - PUROHIT et al., Mol. Cell. Endocrinol., (20060000), vol. 248, page 199
    - LAPLANTE et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20080000), vol. 16, page 1849
    - AYAN et al., Mol. Cancer. Ther., (20120000), vol. 11, page 2096
    - MALTAIS et al., J. Med. Chem., (20140000), vol. 57, page 204
    - MESSINGER et al., Mol. Cell. Endocrinol., (20090000), vol. 301, page 216
    - MOLLER et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20090000), vol. 19, page 6740
    - MESSINGER et al., Mol. Cell. Endocrinol., (20090000), vol. 301, pages 216 - 224
    - PENNING et al., Molec. Cell.Endocr., (20010000), vol. 171, page 137
    - QIU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, page 8368
    - BYDAL et al., Eur. J. Med. Chem., (20090000), vol. 44, page 632
    - DJIGOUE et al., Molecules, (20130000), vol. 18, page 914
    - SAKAKIBARA, M.; UCHIDA, A.O., Biosci. Biotech. Biochchem, (19960000), vol. 60, no. 3, page 405
    - SCHUSTERA, J. Ster. Biochem. Mol. Biol., (20110000), vol. 125, page 148
    - MOLLER, Biioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20090000), vol. 19, page 6740
    - MOLLER, PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, no. 6, page e10969
    - SEDLAK et al., Comb. Chem. High T. Scr., (20110000), vol. 14, page 248
    - NOSKOVA et al., Neoplasma, (20020000), vol. 49, page 418
    - SAREK, J. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 46, no. 25, page 5402