Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469110

EP3469110 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GA RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH
Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5
09599 Freiberg / DE
For all designated states
Helmholtz-Zentrum Dresden - Rossendorf e.V.
Bautzner Landstrasse 400
01328 Dresden / DE
For all designated states
Technische Universität Bergakademie Freiberg
Akademiestrasse 6
09599 Freiberg / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / REINHOLD, Thomas
Anton Güntherstrasse 37
09599 Freiberg / DE
02 / EICHLER, Stefan
Hohestrasse 133
01187 Dresden / DE
03 / WEINERT, Berndt
Turnerstrasse 9
09599 Freiberg / DE
04 / ZEIDLER, Oliver
Appelhof 2
58239 Schwerte / DE
05 / STELTER, Michael
Untere Striegisgasse 9
09600 Oberschöna / DE
 [2019/23]
Former [2019/16]01 / REINHOLD, Thomas
Anton Güntherstrasse 37
09599 Freiberg / DE
02 / EICHLER, Stefan
Hohestrasse 133
01187 Dresden / DE
03 / WEINERT, Berndt
Turnerstrasse 9
09599 Freiberg / DE
04 / ZEIDLER, Oliver
Ziolkowskistrasse 3
09599 Freiberg / DE
05 / STELTER, Michael
Untere Striegisgasse 9
09600 Oberschöna / DE
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731117.213.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64371
Priority number, dateDE20161021045113.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016210451
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216144
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469110
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C22B58/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GA-RÜCKGEWINNUNG[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GA RECOVERY[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE GALLIUM[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS602636  (SHOWA KEIKINZOKU KK) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,14 * Abstract; Tabellen 1, 3, 4 *;
 [XY]  - Michael Stelter ET AL, "Recycling von Gallium aus Prozessrückständen Recycling von Gallium aus Prozessrückständen", (20130101), URL: http://www.vivis.de/phocadownload/Download/2013_rur/2013_RuR_471_480_Stelter.pdf, (20170719), XP055392261 [X] 1-4,6-14 * ("4. Konzept zur Verbesserung der Effektivität und Kostenreduktion des Galliumrecyclings", "5. Bescgreibung der untersuchten Dialyseverfahren", "6. Abstract" * [Y] 5
 [Y]  - Sebastian Brehm, "Polymermembranen", (20150101), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.jenano.de/iomc14media/de/Skripte/08_Polymermembranen.pdf, (20170719), XP055392291 [Y] 5 * S. 11, 13 *
 [A]  - N.N., "Precious Metals - Pyrometallurgy / Hydrometallurgy / Recycling / Waste Minor Metals - Hydrometallurgy / Recycling / Waste Recycling / Waste - Pyrometallurgy / Hydrometallurgy General Pyrometallurgy Process Control Poster Authors Index Keywords Index", (20150617), URL: http://emc.gdmb.de/fileadmin/EMC/diverses/EMC2015Vol2.pdf, (20170719), XP055392296 [A] 1-14 * S. XXV *
by applicantUS5972073
    - Analytical Sciences, (19901000), vol. 6, page 783
    - TSAI et al., Journal of Environmental Science and Health, Part A-Toxic/Hazardous Substances and Environmental Engineering, (20050000), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 477 - 491
    - Separation Purification Technology, (20120000), vol. 90, pages 64 - 68
    - World of Metallurgy - ERZMETALL, (20140000), page 67
    - Journal of Membrane Science, (19950000), vol. 100, pages 229 - 238
    - KORKISCH, Handbook of Ion Exchnge Resins: Their Application to Inorganic Analytical Chemistry, CRC Press, (19890000), vol. VI
    - I. BRENDLER et al., "Untersuchung zur Chlorokomplexbildung des Gallium(III)-Kations in wässriger Lösung", Monatshefte für Chemie, (19920000), vol. 123, pages 285 - 289
    - E. Ocken, "Untersuchung zur Protolyse und Chloro-Komplex-Bildung des Gallium(III)-Kations", Dissertation an der TU Bergakademie Freiberg, page 79
    - P KONDZIELA; J. BIERNAT, "Determination of stability constants of Indium Halogenide complexes by Polarography", Electroanalytical Chemistry and Interfacial Electrochemistry, (19750000), vol. 61, pages 281 - 288
 JP19970338354