Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3452465

EP3452465 - SUBSTITUTED 2, 4-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.01.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genoscience Pharma SAS
10, rue d'Iena
13006 Marseille / FR
[2019/11]
Inventor(s)01 / BRUN, Sonia
Résidence Les Fleurs
Appartement B201
115 Rue Isaac Newton
13100 Aix-En-Provence / FR
02 / BERET, Antoine
54 Chemin de Morgiou
13009 Marseille / FR
03 / BASSISSI, Firas
19 Rue Pierre Laurent
13006 Marseille / FR
04 / HALFON, Philippe
6 Allée du Château
Parc Marveyre
13008 Marseille / FR
05 / COURCAMBECK, Jérôme
50 Boulevard du Vaisseau
Résidence les Hauts de Mazargue
Bâtiment D5
13009 Marseille / FR
 [2019/11]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2019/11]
Application number, filing date17731278.204.05.2017
[2019/11]
WO2017IB52614
Priority number, dateUS201662331844P04.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662331844 P
[2019/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017191599
Date:09.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3452465
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D401/04, C07D493/04, A61K31/4709, A61K31/5377, A61K31/496, A61K31/497, A61K31/506, A61K31/519, A61P35/00
[2019/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/11]
Validation statesMA03.12.2018
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 2,4-DIAMINO-CHINOLINDERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON PROLIFERATIVEN KRANKHEITEN[2019/11]
English:SUBSTITUTED 2, 4-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES[2019/11]
French:DÉRIVÉS SUBSTITUÉS DE 2, 4-DIAMINO-QUINOLÉINE POUR LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES PROLIFÉRATIVES[2019/11]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/11]
03.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO2004080463  (NEOGENESIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-16,26-34,40-51 * page 40; compound 103 * * claims 1, 12, 13, 41, 43 * * page 22, line 24 - line 27 * * page 103, line 3 - line 11 * [A] 17-25,35-39;
 [IA]WO2004002960  (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-16,26-34,40-51 * claims 8, 17, 20 * * examples 263-266 * [A] 17-25,35-39;
 [IP]WO2016067112  (GENOSCIENCE PHARMA [FR]) [IP] 1-51 * claims 1, 2, 21-27 *;
 [A]WO2004020431  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * claims 1, 12, 14 *;
 [A]WO2010151737  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * claims 1, 4, 5 *
by applicantWO2007005643
 WO2007005644
 WO2007016361
 WO2007016431
 US4235871
 WO9614057
 US4737323
    - DRUKER, S. et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20060000), pages 2408 - 2417
    - "Global burden of cancer", JAMA Oncol, (20130000), pages 505 - 527
    - TOVAR, V et al., Gut, (20150000), pages 1 - 11
    - HASHIMOTO, N. et al., BMC Cancer, (20140000), page 722
    - CAREY; SUNDBERG, ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20080000), vol. A
    - ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Plenum Press, (20100000), vol. B
    - VOGEL'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF PRACTICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Longman Scientific and Technical Ltd., (19910000), pages 809 - 816
    - HELLER, Acc. Chem. Res., (19900000), vol. 23, page 128
    - WERMUTH CG et al., The Practice of Medicinal Chemistry, Academic Press, (19960000), pages 671 - 696
    - BUNDGAARD H, A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, Harwood Academic Publishers, (19910000), pages 131 - 191
    - BUCHWALD, SL et al., J. Org. Chem., (20010000), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 2560 - 2565
    - BUCHWALD, SL et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20140000), vol. 136, pages 1617 - 1627
    - SURRY D.S et al., Chemical Science, (20110000), vol. 2, pages 27 - 50
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 161265-03-8
    - SURRY DS; BUCHWALD SL, Chem. Sci., (20110000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 27 - 51
    - DORDUNOO, S. K. et al., Drug Development and Industrial Pharmacy, (19910000), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 1685 - 1713
    - SHEEN, P. C et al., J Pharm Sci, (19910000), vol. 80, no. 7, pages 712 - 714
    - VAN UDEN et al., Plant Cell Tiss. Org. Cult., (19940000), vol. 38, pages 1 - 3,113
    - WENZ, Agnew. Chem. Int. Ed. Engl., (19940000), vol. 33, pages 803 - 822
    - Liposomes: A practical approach, IRL Press, (19900000), pages 33 - 104
    - Comprehensive Heterocyclic Chemistry II, Elsevier, (19970000), vol. 3
    - Liebigs Annalen der Chemie, (19850000), vol. 9, pages 1910 - 16
    - Helvetica Chimica Acta, (19580000), vol. 41, pages 1052 - 60
    - Arzneimittel-Forschung, (19900000), vol. 40, no. 12, pages 1328 - 31
    - LOUIS F. FIESER; MARY FIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, Wiley, (19670000), vol. 1-23
    - Beilsteins Handbuch der organischen Chemie, Springer- Verlag, vol. 4