Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469147

EP3469147 - PENETROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alma Mater Studiorum - Università di Bologna
Via Zamboni, 33
40126 Bologna / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ROCCHI, Irene
Via Palestro 10
40123 Bologna / IT
02 / TONNI, Laura
Via Gaspari 1
40033 Casalecchio Di Reno (Bologna) / IT
03 / GOTTARDI, Guido
Via Eugenio Curiel 13/2
40134 Bologna / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Conti, Marco
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731290.726.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53104
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0420808.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164208
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212366
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469147
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:E02D1/02, G01N25/00, G01N33/24
[2019/43]
Former International [2019/16]E02D1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:PENETROMETER[2019/16]
English:PENETROMETER[2019/16]
French:PENETROMETER[2019/43]
Former [2019/16]PÉNÉTROMÈTRE
Entry into regional phase28.11.2018National basic fee paid 
28.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
28.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2385175  (GOUDA GEO EQUIPMENT B V [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *