Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469147


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.12.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.2019 Change - classification published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019 Change - classification published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019 Change - French title published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
22.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.2018 Change - representative
29.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication