Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468640

EP3468640 - ACTUATOR ASSEMBLY FOR DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GAZELEY, Oliver, Charles
Mews Cottage
8a Windsor Street
County Warwickshire
Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5EY / GB
02 / LEWIS, Gareth, James
Flat 6 St. Bernards Court Harlow Road
High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP11 1BL / GB
03 / PLUMPTRE, David, Aubrey
36 Shire Way
Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB
04 / BOYD, Malcolm, Stanley
28 Whitehead Drive
Wellesbourne Warwickshire CV35 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]01 / GAZELEY, Oliver, Charles
35 Portland Street
Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5EY / GB
02 / LEWIS, Gareth, James
Flat 6 St. Bernards Court Harlow Road
High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP11 1BL / GB
03 / PLUMPTRE, David, Aubrey
36 Shire Way
Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB
04 / BOYD, Malcolm, Stanley
28 Whitehead Drive
Wellesbourne Warwickshire CV35 9PW / GB
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731404.408.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36567
Priority number, dateUS201662347933P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347933 P
US20171561623507.06.2017         Original published format: US201715616235
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214405
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468640
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142, A61M5/32, A61M5/50, A61M5/20
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AKTUATORANORDNUNG FÜR EIN WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:ACTUATOR ASSEMBLY FOR DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE ACTIONNEUR POUR SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IDY]WO2014179774  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [ID] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-22 * [Y] 1-9;
 [Y]WO2011046950  (VALERITAS INC [US]; GONNELLI ROBERT R [US]; LEVESQUE STEVEN F [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]EP3020428  (ABBVIE INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0162]; figures 36, 37 *;
 [Y]WO2012032411  (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH]; HIRSCHEL JUERG [CH]; KAUFMANN NADINE [CH]) [Y] 2-9 * page 14 - page 29 *;
 [Y]US6074369  (SAGE BURTON H [US] ET AL) [Y] 2-9 * column 6 - column 7 *;
 [A]US2011040254  (GYRN STEFFEN [DK] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2013155153
 WO2014179774
 WO2015081337