Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468962

EP3468962 - FXR (NR1H4) MODULATING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BLOMGREN, Peter A.
c/o Gilead Sciences Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
02 / CURRIE, Kevin S.
c/o Gilead Sciences Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
03 / FARAND, Julie
c/o Gilead Sciences Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
04 / GEGE, Christian
c/o Phenex Pharmaceuticals AG
Donnersbergweg 1
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / KROPF, Jeffrey E.
c/o Gilead Sciences Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
06 / XU, Jianjun
c/o Gilead Sciences Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Wallace, Sheila Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17731423.409.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36743
Priority number, dateUS201662349479P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349479 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218337
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468962
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/42, A61K31/415, A61P1/16, A61P3/10, A61P35/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FXR(NR1H4)-MODULIERENDE VERBINDUNGEN[2019/16]
English:FXR (NR1H4) MODULATING COMPOUNDS[2019/16]
French:COMPOSÉS MODULANT LE FXR (NR1H4)[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2013007387  (PHENEX PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-16 * Last compound of claim 5 * [Y] 1-16;
 [IY]WO2011020615  (PHENEX PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-16 * pages 63, 74, 112 * [Y] 1-16;
 [Y]  - CAROTTI, A. ET AL., "Beyond Bile Acids: Targeting Farnesoid X Receptor (FXR) with Natural and Synthetic Ligands", CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2014), vol. 14, pages 2129 - 2142, XP002772460 [Y] 1-16 * figure 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568026614666141112094058
 [A]  - CARR ROTONYA M ET AL, "FXR Agonists as Therapeutic Agents for Non-alcoholic Fatty Liver Disease", CURRENT ATHEROSCLEROSIS REPORTS, CURRENT SCIENCE, US, vol. 17, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11883-015-0500-2, ISSN 1523-3804, (20150218), pages 1 - 14, (20150218), XP035470130 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11883-015-0500-2
by applicantWO2011020615
 WO2009012125
 WO2013007387
    - FOSTER, "Deuterium Isotope Effects in Studies of Drug Metabolism", Trends Pharmacol. Sci., (19840000), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-6147(84)90534-0, pages 524 - 527, XP025943358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6147(84)90534-0
    - F. CHEN et al., Gastroenterology, (20040000), vol. 126, page 756
    - L. ALVAREZ et al., Hum. Mol. Genet., (20040000), vol. 13, page 2451
    - March's Advanced Organic Chemistry: Reactions, Mechanisms, and Structure, John Wiley & Sons
    - DYER et al., Anal. Biochem., (20000000), vol. 282, pages 158 - 161