Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468962 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468962



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 313
13.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
13.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
13.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
13.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 83
05.02.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.08.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
16.08.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
21.12.2017 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 77
08.08.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.07.2017 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.07.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.06.2017 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.06.2017 Annex International Searching Authority 3
19.06.2017 Claims International Searching Authority 6
19.06.2017 Description International Searching Authority 70
19.06.2017 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
19.06.2017 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
19.06.2017 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
19.06.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 7