Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468999

EP3468999 - ANTI-GITR ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DELFINO, Frank
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US
02 / SKOKOS, Dimitris
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US
03 / WANG, Bei
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731435.809.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36818
Priority number, dateUS201662348353P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348353 P
US201662432023P09.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662432023 P
US201762500312P02.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762500312 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214548
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468999
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28, A61K39/395
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA10.01.2019
ME10.01.2019
Validation statesMA10.01.2019
MD10.01.2019
TitleGerman:ANTI-GITR-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2019/16]
English:ANTI-GITR ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF[2019/16]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-GITR ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IDY]WO2006105021  (TOLERRX INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-5,11-15,20-22,27,28 * examples * [Y] 23-26,29,30;
 [IDY]US8709424  (SCHEBYE XIAO MIN [US], et al) [ID] 1-5,11-15,20-22,27,28 * examples * [Y] 23-26,29,30;
 [I]US2015064204  (BEERS COURTNEY [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11-15,20-30 * examples, paragraphs [0433] - [0438], sequences, e.g. 120, 131,149, 238, 295, 297 *;
 [A]  - RUDIKOFF S ET AL, "Single amino acid substitution altering antigen-binding specificity", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19820301), vol. 79, doi:10.1073/PNAS.79.6.1979, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1979 - 1983, XP007901436 [A] 1-5,11-15,20-30 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.79.6.1979
 [Y]  - LEI LU ET AL, "Combined PD-1 blockade and GITR triggering induce a potent antitumor immunity in murine cancer models and synergizes with chemotherapeutic drugs", JOURNAL OF TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL, (20140207), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1479-5876-12-36, ISSN 1479-5876, page 36, XP021176018 [Y] 25,26,29,30 * abstract, figures 1-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-12-36
 [Y]  - KANAMARU F ET AL, "COSTIMULATION VIA GLUCOCORTICOID-INDUCED TNF RECEPTOR IN BOTH CONVENTIONAL AND CD25+ REGULATORY CD4+ T CELLS", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNO, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20040615), vol. 172, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 7306 - 7314, XP009076431 [Y] 23,24 * abstract, page 7309, figure 5 *
by applicantUS5500362
 US5821337
 US7087411
 US2015203579
 US2009142354
 US2011027286
 US2007280945
 WO2006105021
 US8709424
    - REDDY et al., J. Immunol., (20000000), vol. 164, pages 1925 - 1933
    - AI-LAZIKANI et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19970000), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948
    - MARTIN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 9268 - 9272
    - SHIELD et al., JBC, (20020000), vol. 277, page 26733
    - CLYNES et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656
    - TAYLOR et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295
    - PEARSON, Methods Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 307 - 331
    - GONNET et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 256, pages 1443 - 1445
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402
    - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies, Cold Spring Harbor Press
    - REINEKE, Methods Mol Biol, (20040000), vol. 248, pages 443 - 463
    - TOMER, Protein Science, (20000000), vol. 9, pages 487 - 496
    - EHRING, Analytical Biochemistry, (19990000), vol. 267, no. 2, pages 252 - 259
    - ENGEN; SMITH, Anal. Chem., (20010000), vol. 73, pages 256A - 265A
    - JUNGHANS et al., Cancer Res., (19900000), vol. 50, pages 1495 - 1502
    - TUTT et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69
    - KUFER et al., Trends Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 22, pages 238 - 244
    - KLEIN et al., mAbs, (20120000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 1 - 11
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Company
    - POWELL et al., "Compendium of excipients for parenteral formulations", J Pharm Sci Technol, (19980000), vol. 52, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027
    - MORDENTI et al., Pharmaceut. Res., (19910000), vol. 8, page 1351
    - WU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19870000), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432
    - SEFTON, CRC Crit. Ref. Biomed. Eng., (19870000), vol. 14, page 201
    - GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, (19840000), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138
    - LANGER, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533
    - Bioinformatics, (20090000), vol. 25, pages 1105 - 1111
    - Bioinformatics, (20130000), vol. 14, page 33
    - Bioinformatics, (20090000), vol. 25, pages 458 - 464
    - J Immunol, (20150000), vol. 194, pages 446 - 454