Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468827

EP3468827 - OPERATOR STATION FOR AN AUTONOMOUS WORK VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CNH Industrial America LLC
500 Diller Avenue
New Holland, PA 17557 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HUENEMANN, Matthew
6415 Horseshoe Lane
Racine Wisconsin 53402 / US
02 / FOSTER, Christopher Alan
2811 Welsh Road
Mohnton Pennsylvania 19540 / US
03 / LUKAC, John Bradley
8755 Winding Trail
St. John Indiana 46373 / US
04 / JACOBSTHAL, Eric Michael
568 Linden Avenue
Elmhurst Illinois 60126 / US
05 / ASZTALOS, Frank Zsigmond
5405 Possum Ln
Orchard Lake Michigan 48324 / US
06 / JACKSON, Dwayne St. George
12915 Peppertree Dr.
Plainfield Illinois 60585 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)CNH Industrial IP Department
Patent Department
Leon Claeysstraat 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731439.009.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36844
Priority number, dateUS20161517953910.06.2016         Original published format: US201615179539
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017214563
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3468827
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60K26/02, B62D1/02, G05D1/00, B60N2/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BEDIENERSTATION FÜR EIN AUTONOMES ARBEITSFAHRZEUG[2019/16]
English:OPERATOR STATION FOR AN AUTONOMOUS WORK VEHICLE[2019/16]
French:POSTE OPÉRATEUR POUR UN VÉHICULE DE TRAVAIL AUTONOME[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP1967931  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-7;
 [X]JP2006044620  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]JP2006048614  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *