Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469002

EP3469002 - ANTI-COAGULATION FACTOR XI ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
For all designated states
Adimab, LLC
7 Lucent Drive
Lebanon, NH 03766 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Zhu
5 Normandy Ct.
Warren New Jersey 07059 / US
02 / ELLSWORTH, Kenneth, P.
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US
03 / MILLIGAN, James
30 Lauren Lane
New Egypt New Jersey 08533 / US
04 / OLDHAM, Elizabeth
901 S. California Avenue
Palo Alto California 94304 / US
05 / SEIFFERT, Dietmar
12 Village Ct.
Lawrence Township New Jersey 08648 / US
06 / GANTI, Vaishnavi
901 S. California Avenue
Palo Alto California 94304 / US
07 / TABRIZIFARD, Mohammad
901 S. California Avenue
Palo Alto California 94304 / US
08 / PRINZ, Bianka
7 Lucent Drive
Lebanon, NH 03766 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Böhles, Elena
Merck & Co., Inc.
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731444.012.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36940
Priority number, dateUS201662349888P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349888 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218371
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469002
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/36, A61K39/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA14.01.2019
ME14.01.2019
Validation statesMA14.01.2019
MD14.01.2019
TitleGerman:GERINNUNGSHEMMENDE FAKTOR-XI-ANTIKÖRPER[2019/16]
English:ANTI-COAGULATION FACTOR XI ANTIBODIES[2019/16]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-FACTEUR XI DE COAGULATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2015322163  (GRUBER ANDRAS [US], et al) [I] 1-48 * figure all; example all; table all *;
 [I]US2015093395  (GRUBER ANDRAS [US], et al) [I] 1-48 * figure all; example all; table all *;
 [A]  - Cristina Puy ET AL, "Activated factor XI increases the procoagulant activity of the extrinsic pathway by inactivating tissue factor pathway inhibitor", doi:10.1182/blood-2014-10-604587, (20150113), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/bloodjournal/125/9/1488.full.pdf, (20160804), XP055293619 [A] 1-48 * figure all; example all; table all *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2014-10-604587
 [A]  - M. L. VAN MONTFOORT ET AL, "Two novel inhibitory anti-human factor XI antibodies prevent cessation of blood flow in a murine venous thrombosis model", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, DE, (20130808), vol. 110, no. 5, doi:10.1160/TH13-05-0429, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 1065 - 1073, XP055293624 [A] 1-48 * figure all; example all; table all *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1160/TH13-05-0429
by applicantUS8388959
 US8236316
 EP0404097
 WO9311161
 US4816567
 US8877688
 US8691730
 US5545806
 US5569825
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5661016
 US5770429
 US5789650
 US5814318
 US5874299
 US5877397
 US6620135
 US6096002
 US5399163
 US5383851
 US5312335
 US5064413
 US4941880
 US4790824
 US4596556
 US4487603
 US4447233
 US4447224
 US4439196
 US6329511
 WO2013167669
    - WEITZ et al., Chest, (20080000), vol. 133, pages 234S - 256S
    - HAWKINS, Pharmacotherapy, (20040000), vol. 24, pages 62S - 65S
    - ANSELL J et al., Chest, (20080000), vol. 133, pages 160S - 198S
    - CONNOLLY et al., N Engl J Med, (20090000), vol. 361, pages 1139 - 1151
    - PATEL et al., N Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 365, pages 883 - 891
    - GRANGER et al., N Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 365, pages 981 - 992
    - GIUGLIANO et al., N Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 369, pages 2093 - 2104
    - FURIE; FURIE, Cell, (19880000), vol. 53, pages 505 - 518
    - GAILANI; RENNE, J Thromb Haemost, (20070000), vol. 5, pages 1106 - 1112
    - EMSLEY et al., Blood, (20100000), vol. 115, pages 2569 - 2577
    - BULLER et al., N Engl J Med, (20150000), vol. 372, pages 232 - 240
    - KEY, Hematology Am Soc Hematol Educ Program, (20140000), vol. 2014, pages 66 - 70
    - TUCKER et al., Blood, (20090000), vol. 113, pages 936 - 944
    - CHENG et al., Blood, (20100000), vol. 116, pages 3981 - 3989
    - LEUNG et al., Transl Stroke Res, (20120000), vol. 3, pages 381 - 389
    - VAN MONTFOORT et al., Thromb Haemost, (20130000), page 110
    - TAKAHASHI et al., Thromb Res, (20100000), vol. 125, pages 464 - 470
    - CHAN; CARTER, Nat. Rev. Immunol., (20100000), vol. 10, page 301
    - HOLLIGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, Nat. Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136
    - SONGSIVILAI et al., Clin. Exp. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321
    - KOSTELNY et al., J Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553
    - HOLLIGER et al., PNAS USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - TRAUNECKER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659
    - TRAUNECKER et al., Int. J. Cancer, (19920000), vol. 7, pages 51 - 52
    - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495
    - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - PRESTA, J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 116, page 731
    - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - KABAT, Adv. Prot. Chem., (19780000), vol. 32, pages 1 - 75
    - KABAT et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19770000), vol. 252, pages 6609 - 6616
    - CHOTHIA et al., J Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883
    - WATSON et al., Molecular Biology of the Gene, The Benjamin/Cummings Pub. Co., (19870000), page 224
    - Epitope Mapping Protocols in Methods in Molecular Biology, (19960000), vol. 66
    - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, Science, (19850000), vol. 244, page 1081
    - STAHLI et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19830000), vol. 9, page 242
    - KIRKLAND et al., J. Immunol., (19860000), vol. 137, page 3614
    - MOREL et al., Mol. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 25, no. 1, page 7
    - CHEUNG et al., Virology, (19900000), vol. 176, page 546
    - MOLDENHAUER et al., Scand. J. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 32, page 77
    - HARDING et al., Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19950000), vol. 764, pages 536 - 546
    - GREEN et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19990000), vol. 231, pages 11 - 23
    - ANGAL et al., Mol. Imunol., (19930000), vol. 30, page 105
    - SCHUURMAN, Mol. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 38, pages 1 - 8
    - ARMOUR et al., Eur J Immunol., (19990000), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 2613 - 2624
    - SHIELDS et al., J Biol Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, no. 9, pages 6591 - 6604
    - BAERT et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20030000), vol. 348, pages 601 - 608
    - MILGROM et al., New Engl. J. Med., (19990000), vol. 341, pages 1966 - 1973
    - SLAMON et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20010000), vol. 344, pages 783 - 792
    - BENIAMINOVITZ et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20000000), vol. 342, pages 613 - 619
    - GHOSH et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20030000), vol. 348, pages 24 - 32
    - LIPSKY et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20000000), vol. 343, pages 1594 - 1602
    - YANG et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20030000), vol. 349, pages 427 - 434
    - HEROLD et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20020000), vol. 346, pages 1692 - 1698
    - LIU et al., J. Neurol. Neurosurg. Psych., (19990000), vol. 67, pages 451 - 456
    - PORTIELJI et al., Cancer Immunol. Immunother., (20030000), vol. 52, pages 133 - 144
    - CROSET et al., J. Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 161, pages 336 - 348
    - WU, Recombinant DNA, Academic Press, (19930000), vol. 217
    - AUSBEL et al., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., (20010000), vol. 1-4
    - COLIGAN et al., Current Protocols in Protein Science, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., (20000000), vol. 1
    - COLIGAN et al., Current Protocols in Protein Science, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., (20000000), vol. 2
    - AUSUBEL et al., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 16.0.5 - 16.22.17
    - Products for Life Science Research, (20010000), pages 45 - 89
    - BioDirectory, (20010000), pages 384 - 391
    - COLIGAN et al., Current Protcols in Immunology, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., (20010000), vol. 1
    - COLIGAN et al., Current Protocols in Immunology, John Wiley, Inc., (20010000), vol. 4
    - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies A Laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19880000), pages 139 - 243
    - CARPENTER et al., J. Immunol., (20000000), vol. 165, page 6205
    - HE et al., J. Immunol., (19980000), vol. 160, page 1029
    - TANG et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 27371 - 27378
    - BACA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, pages 10678 - 10684
    - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883
    - FOOTE; WINTER, J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 224, pages 487 - 499
    - VAUGHAN et al., Nature Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314
    - BARBAS, Nature Medicine, (19950000), vol. 1, pages 837 - 839
    - MENDEZ et al., Nature, (19970000), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156
    - HOOGENBOOM; CHAMES, Immunol. Today, (20000000), vol. 21, pages 371 - 377
    - Nature Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 397 - 399
    - LE DOUSSAL et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 146, pages 169 - 175
    - GIBELLINI et al., J. Immunol., (19980000), vol. 160, pages 3891 - 3898
    - HSING; BISHOP, J. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 162, pages 2804 - 2811
    - EVERTS et al., J. Immunol., (20020000), vol. 168, pages 883 - 889
    - MENNE et al., Bioinformatics Applications Note, (20000000), vol. 16, pages 741 - 742
    - WREN et al., Comput. Methods Programs Biomed., (20020000), vol. 68, pages 177 - 181
    - VON HEIJNE, Eur. J. Biochem., (19830000), vol. 133, pages 17 - 21
    - VON HEIJNE, Nucleic Acids Res., (19860000), vol. 14, pages 4683 - 4690
    - CAI et al., Eur. J. Pharmacol., (20150000), vol. 758, pages 107 - 114