Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464731

EP3464731 - SNOW REMOVAL EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Kobi Company
Ambachtenlaan 7C
3001 Heverlee / BE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / WAELBERS, Steven
Hertogstraat 147 B103
3001 Heverlee / BE
02 / DE BACKER, Sebastiaan
Korte Ridderstraat 35
2800 Mechelen / BE
03 / WINNELINCKX, Bastiaan
Mussenstraat 82
3000 Leuven / BE
04 / VERSTEDEN, Mart-Joren
Beurtstraat 43
3390 Tielt / BE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)DenK iP
Leuvensesteenweg 203
3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17731490.305.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63633
Priority number, dateBE2016000541703.06.2016         Original published format: BE 201605417
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207823
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464731
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:E01H5/04, E01H5/09, A01D42/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SCHNEERÄUMUNGSAUSRÜSTUNG[2019/15]
English:SNOW REMOVAL EQUIPMENT[2019/15]
French:ÉQUIPEMENT DE DÉNEIGEMENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2015068074  (MAST JAMES W [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-6,8-11,14-16,24,27,28,38-41 * paragraphs [0102] - [0117] * [Y] 2,17-23,31-37 [I] 12,25,26,29,30,42;
 [Y]WO2010114623  (PRASAD HARI [US]) [Y] 2,17-22,31-35 * claim 1 *;
 [X]DE938193  (SCHILLER PAUL) [X] 1,38 * paragraph [0009] *;
 [XI]WO2012094320  (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US]; GERRITTS SAMUEL J [US]; MAST JAMES W [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0040] * [I] 7,13,14;
 [Y]US2508829  (ARMAND LAMY) [Y] 23 * figure 5 *;
 [Y]US5052135  (FONTAINE ANDRE G [CA]) [Y] 36,37 * figures 1-4 *
by applicantWO9914439