Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468622

EP3468622 - METHOD FOR IMPINGING A LIQUID WITH ACCELERATED ELECTRONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastraße 27c
80686 München / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÖNFELDER, Jessy
Heubnerstr. 8a
01309 Dresden / DE
02 / RÖGNER, Frank-Holm
Voglerstraße 27
01277 Dresden / DE
03 / PORTILLO, Javier
Bärenburger Weg 49
01277 Dresden / DE
04 / KUBUSCH, Jörg
Troppauer Str. 19
01279 Dresden / DE
 [2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731497.808.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64034
Priority number, dateDE20161011067209.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110672
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211990
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468622
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/08, G01N21/63, A61L2/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BEAUFSCHLAGEN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT MIT BESCHLEUNIGTEN ELEKTRONEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR IMPINGING A LIQUID WITH ACCELERATED ELECTRONS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR SOUMETTRE UN LIQUIDE À L'ACTION D'ÉLECTRONS ACCÉLÉRÉS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102013109390  (FRAUNHOFER GES ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E V [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [XP]DE102015117939  (FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E V [DE]) [XP] 1,3-9 * figures 1A-D * * paragraphs [0046] - [0052] *
by applicantUS4230947
 US3988588
 DE102013109390