Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472190

EP3472190 - FIBRONECTIN-BINDING PEPTIDES FOR USE IN TUMOR OR FIBROSIS DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETH Zurich
ETH Transfer Raemistrasse 101
8092 Zürich / CH
For all designated states
Paul Scherrer Institut
5232 Villigen PSI / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHABRIA, Mamta
Nassackerstrasse 22
8952 Schlieren / CH
02 / MOSCAROLI, Alessandra
Alderstrasse 28
8008 Zurich / CH
03 / ARNOLDINI, Simon
Bruderholzweg 14
4053 Basel / CH
04 / HERTIG, Samuel
431 Hugo Street
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
05 / VOGEL, Viola
Obere Gasse 15
5400 Baden / CH
06 / BEHE, Martin
Rauracherweg 3
4460 Gelterkinden / CH
07 / SCHIBLI, Roger
Schartenrainstrasse 42
5400 Baden / CH
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Kasche, André
Kasche & Partner AG
Resirain 1
8125 Zollikerberg / Zürich / CH
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17731525.614.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64543
Priority number, dateEP2016017482416.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174824
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216223
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472190
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/435
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:FIBRONECTINBINDENDE PEPTIDE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER DIAGNOSE EINES TUMORS ODER VON FIBROSE UND THERAPIE[2019/17]
English:FIBRONECTIN-BINDING PEPTIDES FOR USE IN TUMOR OR FIBROSIS DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY[2019/17]
French:PEPTIDES DE LIAISON À LA FIBRONECTINE UTILISÉS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DES TUMEURS OU DES FIBROSES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2013192546  (CYTOMX THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] *;
 [A]WO2011097401  (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SCHENNINGS T ET AL, "IMMUNIZATION WITH FIBRONECTIN BINDING PROTEIN FROM STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS PROTECTS AGAINST EXPERIMENTAL ENDOCARDITIS IN RATS", MICROBIAL PATHOGENESIS, ACADEMIC PRESS LIMITED, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19930101), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1006/MPAT.1993.1073, ISSN 0882-4010, pages 227 - 236, XP001022438 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mpat.1993.1073
 [A]  - MEENAN NICOLA A G ET AL, "The tandem beta-zipper model defines high affinity fibronectin-binding repeats within staphylococcus aureus FnBPA", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 282, no. 35, doi:10.1074/JBC.M703063200, ISSN 0021-9258, (20070702), pages 25893 - 25902, (20070702), XP009169811 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M703063200
 [AD]  - SAMUEL HERTIG ET AL, "Engineering Mechanosensitive Multivalent Receptor-Ligand Interactions: Why the Nanolinker Regions of Bacterial Adhesins Matter", NANO LETTERS, US, (20120914), vol. 12, no. 10, doi:10.1021/nl302153h, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 5162 - 5168, XP055425114 [AD] 1-25 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl302153h
 [A]  - MAMTA CHABRIA ET AL, "Stretching fibronectin fibres disrupts binding of bacterial adhesins by physically destroying an epitope", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, United Kingdom, (20101207), vol. 1, no. 9, doi:10.1038/ncomms1135, ISSN 2041-1723, page 135, XP055368792 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms1135
by applicantWO2007128563
 US2015320825
 WO2015048819
    - HYNES, R. O., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 326, no. 5957, pages 1216 - 1219
    - ZARDI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 2337 - 42
    - CARNEMOLLA ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1989), vol. 108, no. 3, pages 1139 - 48
    - WILHELM ET AL., "Analysis of nanoparticle delivery to tumours", NATURE REVIEWS MATERIALS, (2016), vol. 1, pages 1 - 12
    - BERTRAND ET AL., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2014), vol. 66, pages 2 - 25
    - CHABRIA ET AL., NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (2010), vol. 1, no. 135, pages 1 - 9
    - CAO ET AL., PNAS, (20150508), vol. 109, no. 19, pages 7251 - 7256
    - HERTIG ET AL., NANO LETT., (2012), vol. 12, pages 5132 - 5168
    - JUNGMANN ET AL., NAT METHODS, (2014), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 313 - 318
    - RAAB ET AL., CHEMPHYSCHEM, (2014), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 2431 - 2435
    - JOHNSON-BUCK ET AL., NANO LETTERS, (2013), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 728 - 733
    - ZEGLIS ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS, (2015), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 3575 - 3587
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - LARKIN MA ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2007), vol. 23, pages 2947 - 2948
    - KELLEY LA ET AL., NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2015), vol. 10, pages 845 - 858
    - GETTS, D. R. ET AL., TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2015), vol. 36, no. 7, pages 419 - 427
    - ZHONG ET AL., INT. J. OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, (2013), vol. 10, pages 441 - 450
    - ZHAO X.-K., WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2014), vol. 20, pages 14875 - 14883
    - ZHOU ET AL., DRUG DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT AND THERAPY, (2015), vol. 9, pages 4599 - 4611
    - ERLER ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 440, pages 1222 - 1226
    - FLETCHER ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2015), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 350 - 361
    - DATTA, J. ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES, (2015), vol. 17, page 71
    - KATAKOWSKI, J. A. ET AL., MOL THER, (2016), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 146 - 155
    - GRIVAS, P. ET AL., ANN ONCOL, (2017), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 680 - 682
    - YEKU, O.; S. F. SLOVIN, CANCER J, (2016), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 334 - 341
    - DIESENDRUCK, Y.; I. BENHAR, DRUG RESIST UPDAT, (2017), vol. 30, pages 39 - 47
    - D'ERRICO, G. ET AL., CLIN TRANSL MED, (2017), vol. 6, no. 1, page 3
    - XIA, B.; R. S. HERBST, IMMUNOTHERAPY, (2016), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 279 - 298
    - TOPALIAN, S. L ET AL., NAT REV CANCER, (2016), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 275 - 287
    - MARRONE, K. A.; J. R. BRAHMER, CANCER J, (2016), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 81 - 91
    - SWART, M. ET AL., FRONT ONCOL, (2016), vol. 6, page 233
    - PAPAIOANNOU, N. E. ET AL., ANN TRANSL MED, (2016), vol. 4, no. 14, page 261
    - PAOLINO, M.; J. M. PENNINGER, CANCERS (BASEL, (2016), vol. 8, no. 10
    - JANAKIRAM, M. ET AL., IMMUNOTHERAPY, (2016), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 809 - 819
    - HULL, E. E. ET AL., BIOMED RES INT, (2016), page 8797206
    - BERTRAND N. ET AL., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2014), vol. 66, pages 2 - 25
    - HUANG; MILLER, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1991), vol. 12, pages 337 - 357
    - SAMBROOK; RUSSELL, Molecular cloning: A laboratory manual, (2001), vol. 3
    - SIEVERS F ET AL., MOL. SYS. BIO., (2011), vol. 7, page 539
    - EDGAR., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, pages 1792 - 7
    - NOTREDAME ET AL., J OF MOL. BIO, (2000), vol. 302, no. 1, pages 205 - 17
    - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (2002), vol. 350, page 248
    - APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 72, page 211
    - LAU; SUN, BIOTECHNOL ADV., (2009), vol. 27, pages 1015 - 22
    - HRUBY, D. E., "Vaccinia virus vectors: new strategies for producing recombinant vaccines", CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 153 - 170
    - METHODS IN ENZMOLOGY, (2002), vol. 350, page 248
    - WESTERS ET AL., MOL. CELL. RES, (2004), vol. 1694, no. 1-3, pages 299 - 310
    - Martindale: the complete drug reference, 34th ed., PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (2005), page 612
    - E. ENGVALL; E. RUOSLAHTI, "Binding of soluble form of fibroblast surface protein, fibronectin, to collagen", INT. J. CANCER, (197707), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 1 - 5
    - W. C. LITTLE; M. L. SMITH; U. EBNETER; V. VOGEL, "Assay to mechanically tune and optically probe fibrillar fibronectin conformations from fully relaxed to breakage", MATRIX BIOLOGY, (200806), vol. 27, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.matbio.2008.02.003, pages 451 - 461, XP022757522

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matbio.2008.02.003
    - LITTLE ET AL., MATRIX BIOLOGY, (200806), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 451 - 461
    - MEENAN ET AL., J. BIOI. CHEM., (200708), vol. 282, no. 35, pages 25893 - 25902
    - VITI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (199901), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 347 - 352
    - GOTTHARDT ET AL., JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (200704), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 596 - 601
 US20010902822
 WO2001US21860
 US20010313527
 US20010339249