Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463573

EP3463573 - ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCER AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sofwave Medical Ltd.
Tavor Building
2069202 Yokneam / IL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SVERDLIK, Ariel
4 Oley HaGardom Street
6971504 Tel-Aviv / IL
02 / BASSAL, Rana
59 Bet-Lehem Street
3556814 Haifa / IL
03 / GLANTS, Ilya
22A Pines Street
4952902 Petach-Tikva / IL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kramer, Dani
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17731653.606.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IL50638
Priority number, dateUS201662345918P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345918 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017212489
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3463573
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61N7/02, B06B1/06, A61N7/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ULTRASCHALLWANDLER UND -SYSTEM[2019/15]
English:ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCER AND SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:TRANSDUCTEUR ET SYSTÈME ULTRASONORES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
21.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2014022777  (SOUND INTERVENTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,7,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 25] , [0 31] , [0 36]; figures 4,5; claims 2,8 * [Y] 3-6,9,10 [I] 2;
 [XI]WO0045445  (PARALLEL DESIGN INC [US]; CHANDRAN SANJAY [US]; CHARTRAND DAVID [US]) [X] 13 * page 13, line 14 - page 14, line 14; figure 6 * [I] 14-20;
 [XY]WO2013033066  (UNIV DREXEL [US]; LEWIN PETER A [US]; SUNNY YOUHAN [US]; BAWIEC CHRIS) [X] 21 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0 38]; figures 1(a),1(b), 3 * [Y] 22,23;
 [Y]US5620479  (DIEDERICH CHRIS J [US]) [Y] 3-6,9,10 * columns 3, 7-8, lines 22-41, 57-46; figures 2-5 *;
 [Y]US2005251235  (SCHLORFF JAIME L [US] ET AL) [Y] 22,23 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; figures 3-5 *;
 [XP]WO2016090175  (METAVENTION INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,5,7 * paragraphs [0519] , [ 527] - [0547] *;
 [AD]US6595934  (HISSONG JAMES B [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-12 * columns 7-9, paragraphs 62-41; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2008183110  (DAVENPORT SCOTT A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0026] - [0037] - [0064] - [0068]; figures 1,2,10A-13 *;
 [A]  - Epoxy Technology ET AL, "EPO-TEK Adhesives Applications", (20131231), URL: http://www.epotek.com/site/files/brochures/pdfs/pcb_booklet.pdf, (20170926), XP055410092 [A] 1-4,6 * pages 3-5 *
by applicantUS6595934