Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468854

EP3468854 - AGGREGATE TRAIN AND METHODS OF LOADING AND UNLOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georgetown Rail Equipment Company
111 Cooperative Way Suite 400
Georgetown, TX 78626 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / AARON, Charles, W.
1132 Sparrow Lane
Bertram TX 78605 / US
02 / GRAHAM, Joshua, A.
2000 Fm 1460 Apt. 9307
Georgetown TX 78626 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731718.709.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36738
Priority number, dateUS201662348086P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348086 P
US20171561785608.06.2017         Original published format: US201715617856
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214494
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468854
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B61D15/00, E01B27/02, B61D7/32
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AGGREGATZUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BE- UND ENTLADEN[2019/16]
English:AGGREGATE TRAIN AND METHODS OF LOADING AND UNLOADING[2019/16]
French:TRAIN D'AGRÉGATS ET PROCÉDÉS DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DÉCHARGEMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2018National basic fee paid 
14.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE2447635  (MOKSEL ALEXANDER) [X] 1-6,8,11,13,14,16-21,23,25-29 * page 2; figures 1-4; claim 1 * [A] 7,9,15 [I] 12,22,24,30;
 [XA]WO2006038122  (ROSSANIGO CESARE [IT]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 13; figures 1-4 * * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 17 * [A] 4,5,11-13,16-28;
 [IA]WO2010101868  (GEORGETOWN RAIL EQUIPMENT COMP [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11,13-17,19,21-26,30 * figures 1-6; claims 1,11,21 * [A] 3,5,28,29;
 [AD]US2014271071  (AARON CHARLES WAYNE [US], et al) [AD] 1-30 * page 3, paragraph [0034] - page 4, paragraph [0041]; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]JP2013233865  (HOSEN KIKI SEIBI KK) [A] 1-30 * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]EP2194189  (VOLKERRAIL NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [A] 1-3,6,10,11,13,14,19,21,25-28 * abstract *