Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469501

EP3469501 - PATIENT RISK SCORING & EVALUATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc.
4100 Hamline Avenue North
St. Paul, MN 55112-5798 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CONNOLLY, Patrick
Cregcarragh
Claregalway Galway / IE
02 / CAVALERIE, Maureen C.
27 St Stephens Avenue
London W12 8JB / GB
03 / WILSON, Nicolaus
12 rue duroc
75007 Paris / FR
04 / O'GRADY, Barry
20 Ard Na Gaoithe
Upper Clybaun Road
Knocknacarra Galway / IE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17731734.409.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36887
Priority number, dateUS201662348649P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348649 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214586
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469501
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEWERTUNG UND BEURTEILUNG DES PATIENTENRISIKOS[2019/16]
English:PATIENT RISK SCORING & EVALUATION SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE NOTATION ET D'ÉVALUATION DU RISQUE D'UN PATIENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2015023674  (CERNER INNOVATION INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 23, line 14 - page 24, line 14 * * page 57, line 12 - line 20 * * page 61, line 20 - page 62, line 7; figures 5A-5E * * page 63, line 24 - page 65, line 27; figures 5A-5E * * page 66, line 3 - line 21 * * page 67, line 13 - page 68, line 29; figures 6A-6G *;
 [I]US2015213224  (AMARASINGHAM RUBENDRAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0133] *