Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472791

EP3472791 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BUDGET, FINANCIAL ACCOUNT ALERTS MANAGEMENT, REMEDIAL ACTION CONTROLS AND FRAUD MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mastercard International Incorporated
2000 Purchase Street
Purchase, New York 10577 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MALHOTRA, Sandeep
26 Annjim Drive
Greenwich CT 06830 / US
02 / SUBRAMANIAM, Shanthan
54 Travis Road
Baldwin Place NY 10505-2008 / US
03 / LORBERG, Dana, J.
35 Ladue Meadows
St. Louis MO 63141 / US
04 / LOPES, Vitorino Jose, Pereira
42 Obtuse Road South
Brookfield CT 06804 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17731777.313.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37171
Priority number, dateUS201662350335P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350335 P
US201662350322P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350322 P
US201662350407P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350407 P
US201662350416P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350416 P
US201662351016P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351016 P
US201662350831P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350831 P
US201662351227P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351227 P
US201662350821P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350821 P
US201662351164P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351164 P
US201662351155P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351155 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218483
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472791
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/40, G06Q20/10, G06Q20/38
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FINANZPLANUNG, FINANZKONTOALARMVERWALTUNG, GEGENMASSNAHMENSTEUERUNGEN UND BETRUGSÜBERWACHUNG[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BUDGET, FINANCIAL ACCOUNT ALERTS MANAGEMENT, REMEDIAL ACTION CONTROLS AND FRAUD MONITORING[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE BUDGET, D'ALERTES DE COMPTE FINANCIER, DE COMMANDES D'ACTION CORRECTIVE ET DE SURVEILLANCE DE FRAUDE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2018National basic fee paid 
05.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
05.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012158585  (GANTI VISWESWARARAO [US]) [I] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 34 - page 11, paragraph 111 *;
 [I]US2013024358  (CHOUDHURI SOMNATH [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 5, paragraph 54 - page 17, paragraph 157 *;
 [I]US2014250011  (WEBER LANCE [US]) [I] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 21 - page 9, paragraph 117 *;
 [I]US2010250364  (SONG YUH-SHEN [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 40 * * page 8, paragraphs 107-111 * * page 9, paragraph 126 *;
 [I]US2007100748  (DHEER SANJEEV [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 29 - page 6, paragraph 53 *