Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471670

EP3471670 - APPARATUS AND METHOD TO FORM ENTRY BLEB FOR SUBRETINAL DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orbit Biomedical Limited
215 Euston Road
London NW1 2BE / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PRICE, Daniel W.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US
02 / OBERKIRCHER, Brendan J.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US
03 / PRENGER, DanielJ.
10255 Evendale Commons Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US
04 / KING, Geoffrey
10255 Evendale Commons Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US
05 / MEYER, Thomas E.
205 West 4th Street Suite 1140
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
06 / KO, Benjamin L.
4362 Creek Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US
 [2019/18]
Former [2019/17]01 / PRICE, Daniel W.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US
02 / OBERKIRCHER, Brendan J.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US
03 / PRENGER, DanielJ.
10255 Evendale Commons Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US
04 / KING, Geoffrey
10255 Evendale Commons Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US
05 / MEYER, Thomas E.
205 West 4th Street Suite 1140
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
06 / KO, Benjamin L.
205 West 4th Street Suite 1140
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
Representative(s)Bettridge, Paul Sebastian
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17731793.014.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37361
Priority number, dateUS201662351611P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351611 P
US20171560938631.05.2017         Original published format: US201715609386
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218610
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471670
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN VON EINTRITTSBLASE FÜR DIE SUBRETINALE VERABREICHUNG VON THERAPEUTIKA[2019/17]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD TO FORM ENTRY BLEB FOR SUBRETINAL DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENT[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À FORMER UNE BULLE D'ENTRÉE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION SOUS-RÉTINIENNE D'UN AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2016074212  (PRICE DANIEL W [US], et al) [AD] 1-19 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0138]; figures 1-7, 9A-11C, 25-27B *;
 [A]US2015164687  (KASHANI POORIA S [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0051]; figures 2-9 *
by applicantUS2015223977
 US2015351958
 US2015351959
 US2016074212
 US2016074217
 US2016074211
 US2016081849
 US7413734