blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471670 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471670



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 403
15.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
15.08.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
15.08.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
15.08.2019 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
15.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
15.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.04.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.03.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.03.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.02.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 11
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
26.09.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
26.09.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 98
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 84
14.09.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
12.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
12.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
12.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
01.08.2017 Notification relating to priority claim International Searching Authority 2
24.07.2017 Annex International Searching Authority 2
24.07.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 2
24.07.2017 Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - request form for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 1
04.07.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.06.2017 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.06.2017 Annex International Searching Authority 3
20.06.2017 Claims International Searching Authority 4
20.06.2017 Description International Searching Authority 43
20.06.2017 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
20.06.2017 Drawings International Searching Authority 35
20.06.2017 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
20.06.2017 Invitation to Correct Priority Claim (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 3
20.06.2017 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
20.06.2017 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
20.06.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 5