blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471637 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471637



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 257
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.01.2019 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
18.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.12.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
18.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.09.2018 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2018 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.09.2018 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.09.2018 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.07.2018 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.07.2018 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
03.05.2018 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2018 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
03.05.2018 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.01.2018 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
11.01.2018 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
21.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 35
21.12.2017 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
21.12.2017 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.12.2017 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
14.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
14.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
29.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
29.08.2017 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
29.08.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
04.07.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.06.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
16.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
01.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
01.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
01.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
01.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 16
01.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
01.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 14
01.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
01.06.2017 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 37