blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3471637 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780036058 EP16425060 EP17731814



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019520134Global Dossier 18.07.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017EP63332 01.06.2017
EP16425060 17.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109414282Global Dossier 01.03.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017EP63332 01.06.2017
EP16425060 17.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3471637Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2017EP63332 01.06.2017
EP16425060 17.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112018075936 09.04.2019A2
Priority number Date
WO2017EP63332 01.06.2017
EP16425060 17.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL262965D 31.12.2018D0
Priority number Date
WO2017EP63332 01.06.2017
EP16425060 17.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017215938Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP16425060 17.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3257458Global Dossier 20.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP16425060 17.06.2016