Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471637

EP3471637 - BONE PLATE FOR EPIPHYSIODESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthofix S.R.L.
Via delle Nazioni 9
37012 Bussolengo (Verona) / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VENTURINI, Daniele
Via dei Carpini 36
37064 Povegliano Veronese (VR) / IT
02 / MAGNI, Marco
Via Bologna 88
44122 Ferrara / IT
03 / ZACCARIA, Andrea
Via Fracanzana 16
37039 Tregnago (VR) / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Zelioli, Giovanni
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l.
Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17731814.401.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP63332
Priority number, dateEP2016042506017.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16425060
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215938
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471637
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KNOCHENPLATTE ZUR EPIPHYSIODESE[2019/17]
English:BONE PLATE FOR EPIPHYSIODESIS[2019/17]
French:PLAQUE OSSEUSE DESTINÉE À UNE ÉPIPHYSIODÈSE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[ID]FR2922094  (SMALL BONE INNOVATIONS INTERNA [FR]) [ID] 1,3-7,11,12 * page 4, line 27 - line 29; figure 3 * * page 5, line 1 - line 17; figure 11 * * figures 2, 7-10 *;
 [XD]US2008015593  (PFEFFERLE JOACHIM [DE] ET AL) [XD] 1-4,7-12 * figures 1, 5, 7 *;
 [XD]US2008200955  (TEPIC SLOBODAN [CH]) [XD] 1-4,7-12 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2010004691  (AMATO MATTHEW F [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * figure 1A *;
 [AD]US2004111089  (STEVENS PETER M [US] ET AL) [AD] 1,12 * abstract *;
 [AD]US8029507  (GREEN DANIEL W [US] ET AL) [AD] 1,12 * abstract *
by applicantUS8029507
 US2004111089
 FR2922094
 US2008015593
 US2008200955