EP3472287 - FABRIC SOFTENER SHEET AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coin Consulting GmbH Am Fischerhof 18 47807 Krefeld / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Coin Consulting GmbH Fröndenberger Str. 75 58706 Menden / DE | ||
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Coin Consulting GmbH Fröndenbergerstrasse 75 58706 Menden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUSBERG, Marcus Schlesienstr. 27A 58708 Menden / DE | 02 /
PULINA, Michael Am Fischerhof 18 47807 Krefeld / DE | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Gruber, Daniel European Patent Attorney Wittenbergplatz 1 10789 Berlin / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17731867.2 | 19.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017EP64868 | Priority number, date | DE201610210907 | 19.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016210907 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017220458 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472287 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/00, C11D17/04 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D17/049 (EP);
C11D3/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | WEICHSPÜLERTUCH UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2019/17] | English: | FABRIC SOFTENER SHEET AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/17] | French: | LINGETTE ASSOUPLISSANTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 15.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4095946 (JONES KENNETH L, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 29 - line 45 * * column 3, line 39 - line 48; example -; claim - * [Y] 4-8; | [X]EP0957158 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 96] , [0 97]; claim - *; | [X]WO2010066632 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 16 - line 26; claim -; tables 2, 3 *; | [X]GB2513361 (INTELLIGENT FABRIC TECHNOLOGIES PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2 * sentence 4, paragraph 3 - sentence 12 * * page 4, line 6 - line 15; example -; claims 1-23 *; | [YD]DE102013014015 (COIN CONSULTING UG HAFTUNGSBESCHRÄNKT [DE]) [YD] 4-8* paragraphs [0014] - [0018]; claim - * | by applicant | DE102010060126 | DE102013014015 |