Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471556

EP3471556 - METHOD OF TREATMENT USING A BIOCIDAL OR PHYTOPROTECTIVE PRODUCT, DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING TREATMENT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xeda International S.A.
Zone Artisanale la Crau Route Nationale 7
13670 Saint Andiol / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SARDO, Alberto
17 Montée des Tours
13160 Chateaunard / FR
02 / SARDO, Stefano
17 montée des Tours
13160 Chateaunard / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17731875.520.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP65138
Priority number, dateFR2016005573120.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655731
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220612
Date:28.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471556
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23L3/3409, A23B7/144, B65D81/28
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Validation statesMA18.01.2019
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG MIT EINEM BIOZIDEN ODER PHYTOSCHÜTZENDEN PRODUKT, VORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE BEHANDLUNGSANORDNUNG[2019/17]
English:METHOD OF TREATMENT USING A BIOCIDAL OR PHYTOPROTECTIVE PRODUCT, DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING TREATMENT ASSEMBLY[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT PAR UN PRODUIT BIOCIDE OU PHYTOPROTECTEUR, DISPOSITIF ET ENSEMBLE DE TRAITEMENT CORRESPONDANT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6375999  (FORSYTHE DAROL [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO2014001201  (XEDA INTERNAT S A [FR]) [YD] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5918537  (FORSYTHE DAROL [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2014160274  (MULTISORB TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0018]; figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantFR2791910
 WO2014001201